Hudgins et al v. Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Hudgins and Jonathan Rondeno
Defendant: Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv07331
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC's ("TQL") Motion for Protective Order 344 is denied. Defendant is ordered to respond to Plaintiffs' discovery requests within 14 days of this order. The Cou rt sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions 328 : Defendant's response brief is due 2/11/22; Plaintiff's reply is due 2/25/22. [For further details see order]. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 1/21/2022: Mailed notice (gw, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/14/2019: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [dkt. no. 187]. The case is set for an in-person status hearing on June 26, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. for the purpose of setting a trial date and discussing the possibility of settlement. (mk)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/29/2019: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies the defendant's motion to decertify the plaintiff collective [dkt. no. 182]. (mk)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/9/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants defendant's motion to dismiss the claims of plaintiffs Ryan Azeem and Richard Smith [dkt. no. 140] and orders that the statute of limitations on their claims is tolled from the date they opted into this lawsuit through April 9, 2018. Their claims are dismissed without prejudice. (mk)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/8/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court strikes the class action waiver in the arbitration agreements between TQL and Jo nathan Rondeno, Scott Carasik, Amber Cirelli, Evan Finley, Mike Ghebrehiwet, Matthew Hodgson, Christopher McGowan, Christopher Mullen, and Dakota Thornton, and otherwise grants TQL's motion to dismiss these claims [dkt. no. 26]. The Court modif ies its prior ruling on notice to members of the conditionally certified class by (1) limiting notice to those potential members who have not signed arbitration agreements; and (2) directing the parties to promptly develop a list of the potential cla ss members who have not signed arbitration agreements. The parties are to file a joint status report on this issue by no later than February 17, 2017. The status hearing set for February 16, 2017 is vacated and reset to February 21, 2017 at 8:45 AM. Counsel are to jointly call chambers (312-435-5618) at that date and time. (mk)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/23/2016: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, and as further described therein, the Court grants plaintiffs' motion to conditional ly certify a collective action and the issuance of section 216(b) notices [dkt. no. 24]. The Court denies TQL's request to compel arbitration but requests supplemental briefing on its request to dismiss or stay certain plaintiffs' claims wi thout compelling arbitration. The Court directs plaintiffs to file a surreply by January 6, 2017 and directs TQL to file a response to the surreply by January 20, 2017. The case is set for a status hearing, to be conducted by telephone, on January 5, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are to set up a call-in number and are to communicate it to chambers by 12:00 p.m. on January 4, 2017. (mk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudgins et al v. Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hudgins
Represented By: Kimberly De Arcangelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Rondeno
Represented By: Kimberly De Arcangelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Bills
Represented By: Meaghan K. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Gregory Michael Utter
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Bryce J. Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?