Kiebala v. Boris
Plaintiff: George Kiebala
Defendant: Derek Boris
Case Number: 1:2016cv07478
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/29/2017: Defendant's motion to dismiss the amended complaint 32 is granted. Defendant's motion for sanctions 34 is denied. Status hearing of 10/26/2017 is stricken. Case dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated.Mailed notice(mad, )
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 3/29/2017: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 21 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint 21 is granted. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 5/1/2017. Status hearing of 4/20/2017 is stricken and reset to 6/15/2017 at 10:30 a.m.Mailed notice(mad, )
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 2/14/2017: Defendant's motion to dismiss Counts III and V of plaintiff's complaint 7 is granted. Counts I, II, and IV are dismissed, without prejudice. On or before March 16, 2017,Curvy Road and ECS may ratify, join, or be substituted into this action and prosecute their claims for breach of the non-disclosure and revenue share agreements, and for tortious interference with business expectancy. If they fail to do so, Counts I, II, and IV will be dismissed with prejudice.Mailed notice(mad, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiebala v. Boris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kiebala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Boris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?