Rhoads v. Westhost et al.
Plaintiff: Rhoads and Timothy Rhoads
Defendant: Westhost and Singlehop
Case Number: 1:2016cv07620
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2017 Filing 88 Motion by Plaintiff T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 47 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 87 Motion by Plaintiff T. Rhoads for Judgment, Deposit Funds, Enforce Judgment, Forfeiture of Property, to Intervene, Protective Order, Reopen Case, Seal Case, Hearing and Summary Judgment - Redacted Docket No. 46 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 86 Amended Complaint by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 45 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 85 Motion to Expedite by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 42 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 84 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hosting Services - Redacted Docket No. 41-1 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 83 [Corrected] Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hosting Services - Redacted Docket No. 41 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 82 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hosting Services -Redacted Docket No. 38-1 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 81 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Hosting Services - Redacted Docket No. 38 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 80 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hosting Services - Redacted Docket No. 37 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 79 Response by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 32 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 78 Response to Motion to Dismiss by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 31 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 77 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Singlehop - Redacted Docket No. 28 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 76 Exhibits in Support of Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Represenation by Singlehop - Redacted Docket No. 27-1 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 75 Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Representation by SingleHop - Redacted Docket No. 27 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 74 Memorandum by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 24 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 73 Memorandum by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 23 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 72 Memorandum by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 22 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 71 Motion for Misc. Relief by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 20 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 70 Response by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 18 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 69 Appeal for Motion to Seal by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 17 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 68 Response by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 16 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 67 Amended Defendants for Complaint - Redacted Docket No. 15 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 66 Motion for Attorney Representation by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 13 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 65 Response by T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 11 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 64 Response to Request for Financial Information from T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 10 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 63 Letter from T. Rhoads - Redacted Docket No. 7 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 62 Amended Defendants for Complaint - Redacted Docket No. 6 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 14, 2017 Filing 61 Complaint-Redacted docket no. 1 by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
April 11, 2017 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff has filed a motion for leave to seal case, or in the alternative, to file certain documents under seal. #55 Because Plaintiff filed these documents when he was proceeding pro se without appreciating the ramifications, the motion is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to file the documents identified on pages 3 and 4 of his motion in redacted form by 4/14/17. Each redacted document, which will be publicly available, should be filed under a new docket entry that identifies itself as "[Title of document] - Redacted docket no. [docket no. of original document]." The Clerk is hereby ordered to place the following documents under seal: #1 , #6 , #7 , #10 , #11 , #13 , #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #20 , #22 , #23 , #24 , #27 , [27-1], #28 , #31 , #32 , #37 , #38 , [38-1], #41 , [41-1], #42 , #45 , #46 , #47 . Furthermore, in light of Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #57 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court extends its gratitude to recruited counsel, Bradford Lee Livingston of Seyfarth Shaw LLP, for his representation of Plaintiff and his invaluable assistance in this matter. Civil action terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 3, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Bradford Lee Livingston for presentment of Sealed motion #58 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/12/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Livingston, Bradford)
April 3, 2017 Filing 58 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads For Leave to Seal Case, or In the Alternative, to File Certain Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Livingston, Bradford)
March 31, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Rhoads (Livingston, Bradford)
March 31, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Motion by Bradford Lee Livingston for presentment of motion to seal case #55 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/12/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Livingston, Bradford)
March 31, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to seal case or in the alternative to file certain documents under seal (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Livingston, Bradford)
March 31, 2017 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court has been informed that Plaintiff's counsel wishes to file a motion for leave to seal documents under seal, because the motion itself contains confidential information. Plaintiff is therefore given leave to file the motion under seal.Mailed notice (ca, )
March 22, 2017 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 3/22/17. Plaintiff's counsel reports that he will be filing a motion for leave to seal documents and a motion to dismiss the case; the motion should be filed by 3/31/17 and should be noticed up for presentment on 4/12/17 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 4/12/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 17, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE by Bradford Lee Livingston of Change of Address (Livingston, Bradford)
March 17, 2017 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads by Bradford Lee Livingston (Livingston, Bradford)
February 15, 2017 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: As noted in its previous minute orders #48 #49 , the Court has granted Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads's motion for attorney representation and has appointed Bradford Lee Livingston of Seyfarth Shaw LLP to serve as Plaintiff's recruited counsel. To ensure that Rhoads has an adequate amount of time to consult with his newly recruited counsel before the next status hearing, all deadlines in this case are hereby stayed. The status hearing for 3/8/17 at 9:00 a.m. is reset to 3/22/17 at 9:00 a.m. to allow Rhoads and his counsel adequate time to consult with one another. At the next status hearing, Rhoads's counsel should be prepared to report whether he intends to file an amended complaint on Rhoads's behalf consistent with his Rule 11 obligations. The pending motions #46 #47 are stricken without prejudice to refiling later in this case.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #13 is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 14, 2017 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court recruits Bradford Lee Livingston, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, 131 South Dearborn Street, Suite 2400, Chicago, IL 60603, (312) 460-5000, Email: blivingston@seyfarth.com to represent the plaintiff. A status hearing is set for 3/8/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 9, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to appoint attorney ad litem , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for leave to appear as emergency , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to deposit funds , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for disbursement of funds , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to expedite , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for hearing , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for forfeiture of property , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for issuance of warrant in rem , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to intervene , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for judgment of forfeiture , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for judgment , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for protective order , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for release of funds , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for return of property , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to seal , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for writ of garnishment (Rhoads, Timothy)
February 2, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for judgment , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to deposit funds , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to enforce judgment , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for forfeiture of property , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to intervene , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for protective order , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to reopen case , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to seal case , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for hearing , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for summary judgment (Rhoads, Timothy)
February 2, 2017 Filing 45 AMENDED complaint by Timothy Rhoads against All Defendants (Rhoads, Timothy)
February 1, 2017 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 2/1/17. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion to dismiss #28 #37 are granted without prejudice. Plaintiff's emergency hearing of motions and rebuttals to motion for dismissal #42 is stricken as moot. Plaintiff has leave to file an amended complaint. The amended complaint should be filed by 3/1/17. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 1, 2017 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 2/28/17 is reset to 3/8/17 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 30, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to expedite , MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for hearing (Rhoads, Timothy)
January 27, 2017 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by Westhost in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #37 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Siebert, Melissa)
January 27, 2017 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Westhost by Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso (Alton de Eraso, Suzanne)
January 27, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #37 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/1/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
January 27, 2017 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Westhost in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #37 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Siebert, Melissa) (Incorrect PDF document linked to entry, docket text modified by Clerks' Office on 1/27/2017) (mr, ).
January 27, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMPursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Siebert, Melissa)
January 27, 2017 Filing 36 Hosting Services, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates by Westhost (Siebert, Melissa)
January 27, 2017 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Westhost by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Westhost waiver sent on 12/8/2016, answer due 2/6/2017. (gcy, )
January 13, 2017 Filing 33 U.S. MARSHAL AFFIDAVIT of Service regarding Waiver of Service served on Brian Chambers of HR for Westhost on 1/10/17. (gcy, )
January 13, 2017 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
January 10, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Timothy Rhoadsin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMSinglehop's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss #28 (Rhoads, Timothy)
January 9, 2017 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #28 shall be due by 1/31/17; reply due by 2/14/17; ruling will be by mail. A status hearing is set for 2/28/17 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on 1/12/17.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Martin John O'Hara for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #28 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/12/2017 at 09:00 AM. (O'Hara, Martin)
January 5, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMSinglehop's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (O'Hara, Martin)
January 5, 2017 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Defendant Singlehop to motion for attorney representation #13 Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Representation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(O'Hara, Martin)
January 5, 2017 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Singlehop by Martin John O'Hara (O'Hara, Martin)
December 29, 2016 Filing 25 U.S. MARSHAL SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Singlehop on 12/28/2016, answer due 1/18/2017. (gcy, )
December 29, 2016 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
December 29, 2016 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
December 29, 2016 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
December 12, 2016 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion to appeal or request for seal #20 is stricken. Local Rule 5.3(b) clearly specifies that all motions must be accompanied by a notice of motion specifying the date and time on which, and the judge before whom, the motion is to be presented. Defendant is instructed to refile its motion with the proper notice, and is further cautioned to comply with the procedures set forth in this Courts standing order with respect to motion practice.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 6, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to appeal or request for seal. (gcy, )
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: For the reasons provided below, Plaintiff's amended complaint #15 is stricken. Plaintiff's initial complaint #1 stands as the operative complaint in this case. The Court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's deadline to return completed USM-285 (Marshal's service) forms to December 19, 2016. No further extensions will be granted. The Court again advises Plaintiff that a completed USM-285 form is required for each named Defendant. Mailed Notice. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee 12/5/2016.(gcy, ) Modified on 12/7/2016 (gcy, ).
November 23, 2016 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
November 23, 2016 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
November 23, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
November 16, 2016 SUMMONS Issued, copy of the complaint and certified copy of order dated 11/14/16 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to defendant Singlehop, Westhost via email (tt, )
November 14, 2016 Filing 15 COMPLAINT filed by Timothy Rhoads; Jury Demand (Exhibits). (tt, )
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis demonstrates that he cannot prepay the filing fee. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #9 is therefore granted. Plaintiff's previously filed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is stricken as moot. Plaintiff's motion to seal the case #5 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #13 is taken under advisement. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/14/2016. Mailed notice (tt, )
November 14, 2016 MAILED plaintiff copy of order dated 11/14/16 #14 , two blank USM-285 (Marshals service) forms and a instructions. (tt, )
November 3, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for attorney representation. (gcy, )
November 2, 2016 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
November 2, 2016 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
September 26, 2016 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
September 19, 2016 Filing 9 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, )
September 12, 2016 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads (Rhoads, Timothy)
September 8, 2016 Filing 7 LETTER from Timothy Rhoads dated 9/8/16 (Exhibits). (tt, )
August 3, 2016 Filing 6 RECEIVED Amended Defendants to complaint by Timothy Rhoads. (gcy, )
August 3, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads to seal case. Jury Demand. (gcy, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads for leave to proceed in forma pauperis an affidavit. (gcy, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Timothy Rhoads. (gcy, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and o copies by Timothy Rhoads. (gcy, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/6/2016) (gcy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhoads v. Westhost et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Rhoads
Represented By: Bradford Lee Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhost
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singlehop
Represented By: Martin John O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?