GC2 Incorporated v. International Game Technology PLC et al

Plaintiff: GC2 Incorporated
Defendant: International Game Technology PLC, International Game Technology (IGT), DoubleDown Interactive LLC, Masque Publishing, WD Encore Software, DOE Defendants 1-100 and DOE Defendants 101- 2,000,000
Case Number: 1:2016cv08794
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MOTION by Defendants DoubleDown Interactive LLC, IGT, International Game Technology for judgment (Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law on Count XII (Digital Millennium Copyright Act) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J-Part 1, # 12 Exhibit J-Part 2, # 13 Exhibit K)(Parker, Rebekah)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MOTION by Defendants DoubleDown Interactive LLC, IGT, International Game Technology for judgment As A Matter of Law on Count XII (Digital Millennium Copyright Act) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L-Part 1, # 14 Exhibit L-Part 2, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Macey, Eric)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/12/2018: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part as described in the accompanying memorandum opinion and order. The case remains set for a status hearing on November 13, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Lead trial counsel for both are directed to appear. (mk)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/13/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants defendant IGT PLC's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [dkt. # 63]. (mk)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/5/2017: For the reasons described in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies certain defendants' motions to dismiss [dkt. nos. 57, 60, 66] but narrows count 12 of plaintiff's complaint as described in this opinion. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GC2 Incorporated v. International Game Technology PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GC2 Incorporated
Represented By: Courtney A Adair
Represented By: Kirsten M. Ahmad
Represented By: Kara Eve Foster Cenar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Game Technology PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Game Technology (IGT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DoubleDown Interactive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masque Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WD Encore Software
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Defendants 101- 2,000,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?