Petrizzo et al v. DeVry Education Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Petrizzo, Ashley Dellen, Brandy Van Buren, Ethel Holloway, Jorge Munoz, Julio Vargas, Thomas Pearson, Julie Ramroop, Jorge Rivas, Jennifer Wallace, Elijah Morgan, Annette Pearson, Eric Stone, Kirstine Holiness, Cedric Holloway, Heather Anderson, David Viglielmo, Melissa Lotzman, Rhonda Garrison, Nikita Benson, Steven Nickens, Dakar Villa, Steven V Diaz, Debbie Petrizzo, Jairo Jara, Stephanie Cumpton, Jamison Purry, Kenya Montgomery, Lynda Crilley, Suzane Apodaca, Mariel Jennings, Renee Heather Polly, Christopher Condie, DeLeon McKee, Elihu Guiste, Josh Ablian, Darius Bryant, Robyn Petersen, Cheryl Costello, Alex Haberer and Denisse Perez
Defendant: DeVry Education Group, Inc, DeVry/New York Inc., DeVry University, Inc. and DeVry Education Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv09754
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 85 DOCKETING Statement by DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. regarding notice of appeal, #78 (Anscombe, Anthony)
April 1, 2019 Filing 84 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DeVry Education Group, Inc. by Anthony J. Anscombe (Anscombe, Anthony)
April 1, 2019 Filing 83 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Renee Heather Polly (Malmstrom, Carl)
March 18, 2019 Filing 82 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal, #78 ; USCA Case No. 19-1472. (mc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 81 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal, #78 . Notified counsel (mc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal, #78 (mc, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 79 DOCKETING Statement by Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Lynda Crilley, Steven V Diaz, Elihu Guiste, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Elijah Morgan, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Robyn Petersen, Renee Heather Polly, Julio Vargas, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace regarding notice of appeal, #78 (Malmstrom, Carl)
March 15, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of appeal by Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Lynda Crilley, Steven V Diaz, Elihu Guiste, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Elijah Morgan, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Robyn Petersen, Renee Heather Polly, Julio Vargas, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace regarding orders #76 , #77 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-15598262. Receipt number: n (Malmstrom, Carl)
February 13, 2019 Filing 77 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/13/2019: DeVry's motion to dismiss #59 is granted, and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The motion to strike class allegations #62 is terminated as moot. Enter judgment and terminate civil case. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #73 is granted. Theodore Bell is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Motion by Carl V. Malmstrom for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney,, #73 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/15/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION by Attorney Theodore B. Bell to withdraw as attorney for Josh Ablian, Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Nikita Benson, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Cheryl Costello, Lynda Crilley, Stephanie Cumpton, Ashley Dellen, Steven V Diaz, Rhonda Garrison, Elihu Guiste, Alex Haberer, Kirstine Holiness, Cedric Holloway, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Mariel Jennings, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Kenya Montgomery, Elijah Morgan, Jorge Munoz, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Denisse Perez, Robyn Petersen, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Julie Ramroop, Jorge Rivas, Eric Stone, Brandy Van Buren, Julio Vargas, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace. No party information provided (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 25, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE by Carl V. Malmstrom of Change of Address (Malmstrom, Carl)
July 20, 2018 Filing 71 REPLY by Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. to motion to dismiss #59 , motion to strike #62 (Gonsalves, Terance)
June 29, 2018 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM by Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Lynda Crilley, Steven V Diaz, Elihu Guiste, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Elijah Morgan, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Robyn Petersen, Renee Heather Polly, Julio Vargas, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace in Opposition to motion to dismiss #59 , motion to strike #62 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egleston, Gregory)
May 22, 2018 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The briefing schedule on defendants' motion to dismiss #59 and motion to strike #62 is as follows: plaintiffs' response, of up to 40 pages in length, is due 6/29/18. Defendants' reply, of up to 30 pages in length, is due 7/20/18. The court will issue a ruling on the motions via cm/ecf in which any further dates will be set. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #66 is granted. Alan Salpeter and James F. Speyer are terminated as counsel of record. The parties are directed to meet and confer and by 5/24/18, email the courtroom deputy at susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov with a proposed briefing schedule on the defendants' motions to dismiss #59 and to strike #62 . No appearance is necessary on 5/22/18. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion by Alan Norris Salpeter for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #66 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/24/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Salpeter, Alan)
May 16, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION by Attorney Alan N. Salpeter and James F. Speyer to withdraw as attorney for DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc.. No party information provided (Salpeter, Alan)
May 14, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion by Terance A Gonsalves for presentment of motion to strike #62 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/22/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 14, 2018 Filing 64 SUPPLEMENT to other #63 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Class Action Allegations (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 14, 2018 Filing 63 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Class Action Allegations by DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 14, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION by Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. to strike (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 14, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Terance A Gonsalves for presentment of motion to dismiss #59 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/22/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 14, 2018 Filing 60 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 14, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION by Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc., DeVry University, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 14, 2018 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The Motion for Leave to File a Brief Exceeding the Page Limit #56 is granted. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Motion by Terance A Gonsalves for presentment of motion for leave to file #56 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/14/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 9, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION by Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. for leave to file a Brief Exceeding the Page Limit (Gonsalves, Terance)
April 12, 2018 Filing 55 FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AMENDED complaint by Darius Bryant, Elijah Morgan, Renee Heather Polly, Cedric Holloway, DeLeon McKee, Thomas Pearson, Jairo Jara, Annette Pearson, Dakar Villa, David Viglielmo, Lynda Crilley, Steven V Diaz, Elihu Guiste, Steven Nickens, Suzane Apodaca, Robyn Petersen, Jennifer Wallace, Melissa Lotzman, Heather Anderson, Christopher Condie against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Bell, Theodore)
April 10, 2018 Filing 54 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by Terance A Gonsalves (Gonsalves, Terance)
April 9, 2018 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file additional appearance of counsel #51 is granted. No appearance on 4/11/18 is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 30, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion by Terance A Gonsalves for presentment of motion for leave to file #51 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/11/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Gonsalves, Terance)
March 30, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION by Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. for leave to file Additional Appearance (Gonsalves, Terance)
February 27, 2018 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #47 is granted. R. Ryan Stoll, Jack P. DiCanio, Amy S. Park, Emily Reitmeier and Peter Cheun are terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on 3/6/18 is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 27, 2018 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' amended complaint is due 4/12/18. Defendant must respond to the complaint by 5/14/18. If defendant's responsive pleading is a motion to dismiss, no notice of presentment is necessary. Plaintiffs' response will be due 6/13/18; defendant's reply 6/28/18. Continued status hearing is set for 8/15/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 27, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Motion by R. Ryan Stoll for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #47 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/6/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Stoll, R.)
February 27, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION by Attorney R. Ryan Stoll, Jack P. DiCanio, Amy S. Park, Emily Reitmeier and Peter Cheun to withdraw as attorney for DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc.. No party information provided (Stoll, R.)
February 12, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/12/2018: DeVry's motion to dismiss, #23 , is granted. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. [For further detail see attached order.] A status hearing is set for 2/27/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 13, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE by Bryan Michael Westhoff of Change of Address (Westhoff, Bryan)
August 7, 2017 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #42 is granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 29, 2017 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. The court will issue a ruling on the motion to dismiss #23 via cm/ecf in which any further dates will be set. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 27, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13318290. (Burt, Thomas)
June 26, 2017 Filing 41 STATUS Report (Joint) by Debbie Petrizzo (Bell, Theodore)
June 20, 2017 Filing 40 AGREED Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/20/2017. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 24, 2017 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: At the parties' request, the status hearing is reset to 6/29/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by James F. Speyer (Speyer, James)
April 28, 2017 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing is reset to 6/15/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 5, 2017 Filing 36 REPLY by Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #23 In Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Stoll, R.)
March 31, 2017 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by Bryan Michael Westhoff (Westhoff, Bryan)
March 31, 2017 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by Alan Norris Salpeter (Salpeter, Alan)
March 7, 2017 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #32 is granted. Gregory Michael Egleston is added as counsel of record. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 7, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12933747. (Egleston, Gregory)
March 6, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Josh Ablian, Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Nikita Benson, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Cheryl Costello, Lynda Crilley, Stephanie Cumpton, Ashley Dellen, Steven V Diaz, Rhonda Garrison, Elihu Guiste, Alex Haberer, Kirstine Holiness, Cedric Holloway, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Mariel Jennings, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Kenya Montgomery, Elijah Morgan, Jorge Munoz, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Denisse Perez, Robyn Petersen, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Julie Ramroop, Jorge Rivas, Eric Stone, Brandy Van Buren, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #23 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Bell, Theodore)
March 6, 2017 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file excess pages #28 is granted. Plaintiff may use 25 pages for their response. The court notes that defendants did not require more than 15 pages for their opening memorandum #24 , but in light of plaintiffs' request for more than 15 pages in response, defendants are given 20 pages for their reply brief. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 3, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Theodore Beloyeannis Bell for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, #28 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/8/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Bell, Theodore)
March 3, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiffs Josh Ablian, Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Nikita Benson, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Cheryl Costello, Lynda Crilley, Stephanie Cumpton, Ashley Dellen, Steven V Diaz, Rhonda Garrison, Elihu Guiste, Alex Haberer, Kirstine Holiness, Cedric Holloway, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Mariel Jennings, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Kenya Montgomery, Elijah Morgan, Jorge Munoz, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Denisse Perez, Robyn Petersen, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Julie Ramroop, Jorge Rivas, Eric Stone, Brandy Van Buren, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace for leave to file excess pages (Bell, Theodore)
February 10, 2017 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for excess pages and to file status report instanter #25 is granted. The parties need not file the status report as a separate entry on the docket. The court has reviewed the proposals by the parties and enters the following scheduling order. Briefing on the motion to dismiss will proceed on the schedule previously set, and for now, no bifurcation of discovery or deadline for the filing of a motion for class certification will be set. The parties may proceed with written discovery while the motion to dismiss is briefed and under advisement. Initial disclosures shall be exchanged by 3/31/17, and written discovery may be issued on or after 3/20/2017. The parties are advised that since there is likely an overlap between merits issues and class certification issues, subject-matter bifurcation is not likely to be workable, at least in the early months of discovery, and they should proceed accordingly. If plaintiffs expect to conduct any discovery after a ruling on class certification, then they must be prepared to file a motion for class certification well before April 2018, unless there are delays attributable to the court's disposition of the motion to dismiss. As in Robinson v. DeVry, 16-cv-7447, the court expects the parties to meet and confer to conduct reasonable, cost-effective discovery while the motion to dismiss is pending. No appearance on 2/14/17 is necessary. Status hearing is reset to 5/4/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 9, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Theodore Beloyeannis Bell for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,,,,,,, motion to file instanter,,,,,, #25 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/14/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Bell, Theodore)
February 9, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiffs Josh Ablian, Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Nikita Benson, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Cheryl Costello, Lynda Crilley, Stephanie Cumpton, Ashley Dellen, Steven V Diaz, Rhonda Garrison, Elihu Guiste, Alex Haberer, Kirstine Holiness, Cedric Holloway, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Mariel Jennings, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Kenya Montgomery, Elijah Morgan, Jorge Munoz, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Denisse Perez, Robyn Petersen, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Julie Ramroop, Jorge Rivas, Eric Stone, Brandy Van Buren, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace for leave to file excess pages , MOTION by Plaintiffs Josh Ablian, Heather Anderson, Suzane Apodaca, Nikita Benson, Darius Bryant, Christopher Condie, Cheryl Costello, Lynda Crilley, Stephanie Cumpton, Ashley Dellen, Steven V Diaz, Rhonda Garrison, Elihu Guiste, Alex Haberer, Kirstine Holiness, Cedric Holloway, Ethel Holloway, Jairo Jara, Mariel Jennings, Melissa Lotzman, DeLeon McKee, Kenya Montgomery, Elijah Morgan, Jorge Munoz, Steven Nickens, Annette Pearson, Thomas Pearson, Denisse Perez, Robyn Petersen, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Julie Ramroop, Jorge Rivas, Eric Stone, Brandy Van Buren, David Viglielmo, Dakar Villa, Jennifer Wallace to file instanter Agreed Motion for Enlargement of the Page Limits and for Leave to File the Parties' Joint Initial Status Report Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bell, Theodore)
February 3, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #23 (Stoll, R.)
February 3, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Stoll, R.)
February 3, 2017 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by Peter Young-hyun Cheun (Cheun, Peter)
December 5, 2016 Filing 21 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED complaint by Renee Heather Polly, Debbie Petrizzo, Cheryl Costello, Brandy Van Buren, Melissa Lotzman, Jamison Purry, Dakar Villa, Rhonda Garrison, DeLeon McKee, Heather Anderson, Stephanie Cumpton, Julie Ramroop, Elihu Guiste, Jorge Munoz, Denisse Perez, Ashley Dellen, Jorge Rivas, Christopher Condie, Cedric Holloway, Steven V Diaz, Robyn Petersen, Jairo Jara, Josh Ablian, Elijah Morgan, Ethel Holloway, Kirstine Holiness, Nikita Benson, Kenya Montgomery, Darius Bryant, Thomas Pearson, Steven Nickens, David Viglielmo, Annette Pearson, Alex Haberer, Mariel Jennings, Eric Stone, Lynda Crilley, Suzane Apodaca, Jennifer Wallace against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bell, Theodore) (Docket Text Modified on 12/6/2016 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
November 29, 2016 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by Jack Patrick DiCanio (DiCanio, Jack)
November 29, 2016 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by Amy S. Park (Park, Amy)
November 28, 2016 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 #13 are granted. The motion to consolidate cases #16 is granted. Jara, et al. v. DeVry Education Group, Inc., et al. is consolidated with the present case for all further purposes. All future filings will be made in the present case. Plaintiffs' consolidated amended class action complaint is due 12/5/16. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond by 2/3/17. If defendants' responsive pleading is a motion to dismiss, no notice of presentment is necessary. Plaintiffs' response will be due 3/6/17; defendants' reply will be due 4/5/17. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Status hearing is reset to 2/14/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
November 22, 2016 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cheryl Costello, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Brandy Van Buren to set a briefing schedule (Joint). (Omitted relief from motion #16 ). (pk, )
November 22, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Theodore Beloyeannis Bell for presentment of motion to consolidate cases, #16 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/29/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Bell, Theodore)
November 22, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cheryl Costello, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Brandy Van Buren to consolidate cases Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases and Joint Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule (Bell, Theodore)
November 17, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE by Theodore Beloyeannis Bell of Change of Address (Bell, Theodore)
November 17, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE by Carl V. Malmstrom of Change of Address (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 15, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12568491. (DiCanio, Jack)
November 14, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12563994. for Amy S. Park (Park, Amy)
November 7, 2016 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Defendants must answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff Petrizzo's complaint by 11/29/16. Status hearing is set for 1/19/2017 at 09:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
November 2, 2016 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 and a finding of relatedness to case 16-cv-7447. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/2/2016. (eaa, )
October 31, 2016 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by Emily Anne Reitmeier (Reitmeier, Emily)
October 31, 2016 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. (Stoll, R.)
October 31, 2016 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. by R. Ryan Stoll (Stoll, R.)
October 21, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Costello, Brandy Van Buren, Renee Heather Polly, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Jamison Purry as to DeVry/New York Inc. on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016. (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 18, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Costello, Brandy Van Buren, Renee Heather Polly, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Jamison Purry as to DeVry University, Inc. on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016. (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 18, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Costello, Brandy Van Buren, Renee Heather Polly, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Jamison Purry as to DeVry Education Group, Inc. on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016. (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 18, 2016 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants DeVry Education Group, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., DeVry/New York Inc. (pg, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cheryl Costello, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Brandy Van Buren by Carl Vincent Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 18, 2016 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cheryl Costello, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Renee Heather Polly, Jamison Purry, Brandy Van Buren by Theodore Beloyeannis Bell (Bell, Theodore)
October 17, 2016 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (dc, )
October 14, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cheryl Costello, Brandy Van Buren, Renee Heather Polly, Melissa Lotzman, Debbie Petrizzo, Jamison Purry; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12468924. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrizzo et al v. DeVry Education Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Dellen
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Van Buren
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Holloway
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Munoz
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pearson
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ramroop
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Rivas
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wallace
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Morgan
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Pearson
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stone
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirstine Holiness
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Holloway
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Anderson
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Viglielmo
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Lotzman
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Garrison
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikita Benson
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nickens
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakar Villa
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven V Diaz
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Petrizzo
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jairo Jara
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Cumpton
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamison Purry
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Montgomery
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Crilley
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzane Apodaca
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariel Jennings
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Heather Polly
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Condie
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeLeon McKee
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elihu Guiste
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Ablian
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Bryant
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Petersen
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Costello
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Haberer
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denisse Perez
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry Education Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry/New York Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Peter Young-hyun Cheun
Represented By: James F. Speyer
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Represented By: Terance A Gonsalves
Represented By: Emily Anne Reitmeier
Represented By: Alan Norris Salpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry University, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Peter Young-hyun Cheun
Represented By: James F. Speyer
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Represented By: Terance A Gonsalves
Represented By: Emily Anne Reitmeier
Represented By: Alan Norris Salpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry Education Group, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Peter Young-hyun Cheun
Represented By: James F. Speyer
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Represented By: Terance A Gonsalves
Represented By: Emily Anne Reitmeier
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Alan Norris Salpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?