Aslani v. McCarthy
Plaintiff: Maryam Aslani
Defendant: Renee McCarthy
Case Number: 1:2016cv10476
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, the sole remaining defendant Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois is granted leave to file an Amended Answer on or before August 24, 2017. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/10/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, motion to dismiss 46 is granted. Accordingly, defendants Amy Truelove, Kathleen Kashima and Timothy Murphy are dismissed from the Amended Complaint. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/2/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/6/2017. Mailed notice (mma, )
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, plaintiff's motion for consolidation 25 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/30/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, this Court sets a status hearing for 9:15 a.m. February 16, 2017, at which Aslani (or any attorney who she may have retained by that time) and attorney Eveland are ordered to be pres ent. If no arrangements have been made before then to move this case forward in a meaningful fashion, this Court will give serious consideration to dismissal of the action for want of prosecution. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/1/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM : Because Aslani's self-prepared Complaint really cannot be dealt with as a viable pleading in its present form, this sua sponte memorandum confirms that no appropriate action is possible on Aslani's lawsuit until the present Co mplaint is replaced by an Amended Complaint that will permit defendant McCarthy and this Court to deal with it in an effective way. (For further detail see Memorandum.) Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/14/2016. Mailed notice. (etv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aslani v. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryam Aslani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?