Zoller et al v. UBS Securities LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Zoller and Alexander Beigelman
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC, UBS Financial Services Inc. and UBS Americas Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv11277
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/5/2019: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the defendants' motion to compel arbitration [dkt. no. 25]. Because the plaintiffs' claims will proceed, if at all, in arbitration, the Court directs the Clerk to administratively terminate the case as a pending case. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/19/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies UBS's motion to dismiss Beigelman's claims and to compel arbit ration of Zoller's claims [dkt. no. 25]. The Court also sees no appropriate basis to stay litigation of Beigelman's claims pending resolution of his arbitration. The case is set for a status hearing on April 3, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. to set a schedule for further proceedings. Counsel are directed to confer in advance of the status hearing to attempt to agree on a schedule to propose to the Court. (mk)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM Order issued regarding pending Motion 25 . Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/24/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoller et al v. UBS Securities LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Zoller
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Beigelman
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Represented By: James L. Komie
Represented By: Laurie Amber Perez
Represented By: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Molly T Senger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Represented By: James L. Komie
Represented By: Laurie Amber Perez
Represented By: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Molly T Senger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Americas Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Represented By: James L. Komie
Represented By: Laurie Amber Perez
Represented By: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Molly T Senger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?