Wert et al v. Cohn et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Wert and Richard D. Kincaid
Defendant: Stuart Cohn, Zvi Feiner, David Jonathan Rosenberg, Scott Appleby and Avi Fox
Case Number: 1:2017cv00219
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/12/2019: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants Feiner's motion for summary judgment [dkt. no. 180], Avi Fox's motion for partial summary judgment [dkt. no. 222], and Rosenberg's motion for summary judgment [dkt. no. 225]. The case is set for a status hearing on April 22, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. to set a schedule for any further proceedings required to bring the remainder of the case to a conclusion. (mk)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/31/2018: The Court declines to approve the proposed settlement of the claims against defendant Stuart Cohn for the reasons described in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order. The case is set for a status hearing on January 7, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss a schedule for further proceedings. (mk)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/20/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Order, the Court denies Simons's motion for leave to file and spread of record the turnover order and his purported citation liens. (mk)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/1/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants defendants' motions to dismiss in part. Specifically, the Court dis misses the derivative claims in Counts 2, 3, 6, and 7 with leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days but otherwise denies defendants motions to dismiss [dkt. nos. 70, 74, 76, & 77]. The case is set for a status hearing on September 11, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. for the purpose of setting a discovery and pretrial schedule. (mk)(Kennelly, Matthew)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wert et al v. Cohn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Wert
Represented By: Dean A. Dickie
Represented By: Eric J Gribbin
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Kincaid
Represented By: Dean A. Dickie
Represented By: Eric J Gribbin
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zvi Feiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jonathan Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Appleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?