Bautista Herrera v. Grand Sports Arena, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adolfo Bautista Herrera
Defendant: Grand Sports Arena, LLC, MASL Soccer, LLC and Armando Gamboa
Case Number: 1:2017cv00452
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION by Plaintiff Adolfo Bautista Herrera for judgment (motion to amend judgment and renewed motion for entry of judgment) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caffarelli, Alejandro)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 12/11/2018. Mailed notice(cdh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION by Plaintiff Adolfo Bautista Herrera for judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Offer of Judgment))(Caffarelli, Alejandro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bautista Herrera v. Grand Sports Arena, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolfo Bautista Herrera
Represented By: Alejandro Caffarelli
Represented By: Alexis D Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Sports Arena, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASL Soccer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?