Martensen v. Chicago Stock Exchange
Plaintiff: Martensen and Jeffrey Martensen
Defendant: Chicago Stock Exchange
Case Number: 1:2017cv01494
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I Shadur
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Filing 39 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 2/20/2018 regarding notice of appeal #29 ; USCA No. 17-2660. Accordingly, The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (ags, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 1/11/2018; Decided 2/20/2018 in USCA case no. 17-2660 (ags, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 3/21/2018 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #29 ; Appellate case no. : 17-2660. Accordingly, Plaintiff-appellant filed a petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc on March 6, 2018. No judge in regular active service has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc, and all of the judges on the panel have voted to deny rehearing. The petition for rehearing is therefore DENIED. (ags, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 36 MANDATE of USCA dated 3/29/2018 regarding notice of appeal #29 ;USCA No.17-2660 ; No record to be returned. (ags, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 35 CERTIFIED and transmitted to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #29 (USCA no. 17-2660) Via Email. (ek, )
November 17, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding notice of appeal #29 ; USCA Case No. 17-2660. (lf, )
August 28, 2017 Filing 33 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Jeffrey Martensen (Martensen, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2017 Filing 32 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #29 ; USCA Case No. 17-2660. (lf, )
August 15, 2017 Filing 31 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #29 . Notified counsel (smm)
August 15, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #29 . (smm)
August 15, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of appeal by Jeffrey Martensen regarding orders #28 , #18 , #19 , #17 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13477866. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Martensen, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2017 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, plaintiff's motion to vacate order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) and motion for leave to amend complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) #21 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/19/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 17, 2017 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Attorneys Richard J. Gonzalez and Jaz Park are terminated.Mailed notice (clw, )
July 17, 2017 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM Order: On July 11, 2017 this Court issued its memorandum order dealing with the effort by Jeffrey Martensen ("Martensen") to revisit this Court's dismissal of his Complaint and this action. Meanwhile his counsel has filed a motion to withdraw from his representation pursuant to this District Court's LR 83.17. This Court grants that motion, for it consistently views such motions (whether initiated by a lawyer or by a dissatisfied client) as the equivalent of no-fault divorce, for in either event it would be inappropriate to compel the two to be linked together. Accordingly Martensen must proceed pro se unless he promptly retains replacement counsel. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/17/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 11, 2017 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM Order: After this Court dismissed the Complaint and this action, brought by Jeffrey Martensen ("Martensen") under the section of the Dodd-Frank Act ("Act") prohibiting retaliatory conduct, because Martensen did not qualify as a "whistleblower" as defined by the Act, Martensen filed a motion to vacate the dismissal order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. ("Rule") 60(b) and a motion for leave to amend the Complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a) (Dkt. No. 21) but two days later (on July 5) Martensen's counsel filed a motion to withdraw pursuant to this District Court's LR 83.17 (Dkt. No. 22) together with an affidavit in support of that motion (Dkt. No. 23) that cast critical doubt on what Martensen is now seeking to do. In part Martensen has now asserted that he indeed a "statutory whistleblower" because he assertedly had "prior contact with the SEC, which included contact via the SEC website and in person discussions" but he has not provided a "proposed amendment to the complaint detailing plaintiff's prior interaction with SEC." Accordingly this Court is not in a position to rule on Martensen's current Dkt. No. 21 motion without Martensen's submission of his proposed amended complaint. Hence he is ordered to submit that proposed amended complaint on or before July 31, 2017, failing which his current motion must be denied. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/11/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 11, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Chicago Stock Exchange in Opposition to motion to vacate #21 (Williams, Darin)
July 5, 2017 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Gonzalez and Jaz Park in support of motion to withdraw (Gonzalez, Richard)
July 5, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION by Attorney Richard Gonzalez and Jaz Park to withdraw as attorney for Jeffrey Martensen. No party information provided (Gonzalez, Richard)
July 3, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Jeffrey Martensen to vacate (Martensen, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2017 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffrey Martensen by Jeffrey W Martensen (Martensen, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2017 Filing 19 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice(clw, )
June 7, 2017 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/7/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
June 7, 2017 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Defendant's motion to dismiss #12 is granted. Both the Complaint and this action are dismissed. Status hearing set for 7/24/2017 is stricken. (For further details see Memorandum Opinion and Order) Mailed notice (clw, )
June 1, 2017 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Stock Exchange by Darin Matthew Williams (Williams, Darin)
May 30, 2017 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Motion hearing set for 6/1/2017 is vacated, to be rescheduled at a later date.Mailed notice (clw, )
May 26, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Stephen Bradley for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/1/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Bradley, Thomas)
May 26, 2017 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Chicago Stock Exchange in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 (Bradley, Thomas)
May 26, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMPursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Bradley, Thomas)
April 24, 2017 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Status hearing held on 4/24/2017. Status hearing set for 7/24/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (clw, )
April 24, 2017 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Stock Exchange by Joseph Michael Gagliardo (Gagliardo, Joseph)
April 24, 2017 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Stock Exchange by Thomas Stephen Bradley (Corrected) (Bradley, Thomas)
April 24, 2017 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Stock Exchange by Thomas Stephen Bradley (Bradley, Thomas)
April 6, 2017 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jeffrey Martensen. Chicago Stock Exchange waiver sent on 2/27/2017, answer due 4/28/2017. (Gonzalez, Richard)
March 15, 2017 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur: This is the initial scheduling order entered by this Court after the filing of the Complaint. Counsel for plaintiff are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to defendant in the same manner that process has been or is being served on defendant. There will be a status hearing--a "scheduling conference", as that term is used in attached Fed. R. Civ. P. ("Rule") 16(b), at 9:00 a.m. on April 24, 2017. If defendant has been served with process or has appeared at least 28 days before that Status Hearing Date, counsel for both parties are ordered to meet not later than 14 days before the Status Hearing Date to comply with the provisions of Rules 26(f) and 26(a) (c) and this District Court's LR 26.1 Counsel for the parties are urged to undertake serious settlement efforts before the scheduled Status Hearing when no major investment in counsel's time (and clients' money) has yet taken place. If such efforts are unsuccessful, counsel should be prepared to attend the scheduled Status Hearing to discuss briefly their proposed discovery plan and other subjects appropriate for inclusion in the scheduling order as referred to in Rule 16(b). No written status report is to be filed. Although this Court will not set a close-of-discovery scheduling order until both sides have a good sense of the time needed for that purpose, the parties are urged to join in setting their own target dates in that respect at their initial Rule 26(f) conference and to review those target dates regularly during the discovery process. If any party is unrepresented by counsel, that party must comply with this order personally. Mailed notice (clw, )
February 28, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffrey Martensen by Jaz Park (Park, Jaz)
February 27, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to COUNSEL FOR CHGO STOCK EXCHANGE on 02/27/2017 by Plaintiff Jeffrey Martensen. Waiver of service due by 4/28/2017. (Gonzalez, Richard)
February 27, 2017 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffrey Martensen by Richard J. Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Richard)
February 27, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gonzalez, Richard)
February 27, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Martensen; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12900444.(Gonzalez, Richard)
February 27, 2017 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Milton I. Shadur. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. (meg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martensen v. Chicago Stock Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Stock Exchange
Represented By: Joseph Michael Gagliardo
Represented By: Darin Matthew Williams
Represented By: Thomas Stephen Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Martensen
Represented By: Jaz Park
Represented By: Jeffrey W Martensen
Represented By: Richard J. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?