The Solutions Team, Inc. v. Oak Street Health, MSO, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: The Solutions Team, Inc.
Defendant: Oak Street Health, MSO, LLC., Focus Solutions, LLC. and Bruce Schaumburg
Case Number: 1:2017cv01879
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings on 7/16/2021. Mailed notice(cc, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 9/21/2020. Mailed notice(cdh, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings on 1/2/2020.(rbf, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 2/6/2019. Before the Court are the motion to dismiss 24 filed by Defendant Oak Street Health, MSO, LLC ("Oak Street"), and the motion to dismiss 28 filed by Defendants Focus Solutions LLC and its owner Bruce Schaumberg. For the reasons set forth below, the motions [24; 28] are granted. Further status hearing set for February 21, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(cdh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Solutions Team, Inc. v. Oak Street Health, MSO, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Solutions Team, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P Ellenbecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Street Health, MSO, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Solutions, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Schaumburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?