Godo et al v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Godo and Dawn Godo
Defendant: Abbvie Products LLC, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare, S.A., Abbvie, Inc., Anda, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc and Besins Healthcare, Inc
Case Number: 1:2017cv04517
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 ENTERED JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Court's order of 8/17/2018 in the MDL 2545 master file, Case No. 14 C 1748 (dkt. no. 2841) final judgment is entered in favor of Besins. Besins Healthcare, Inc and Besins Healthcare, S.A. terminated. Mailed notice. (rp, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to entry 2762 in the lead MDL case (14 C 1748), Attorney Andrew W. Knox is terminated and Attorney Carrie R. Capouellez is added as of attorney of record for plaintiff. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 27, 2017 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. by Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2017 Filing 11 Short Form ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Thomas, Joseph)
September 27, 2017 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. by Joseph P Thomas (Thomas, Joseph)
September 27, 2017 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. by Jeffrey Francis Peck (Peck, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2017 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. by Kerry Carson Green (Green, Kerry)
September 14, 2017 Filing 7 DUPLICATE FILING of entry no. #6 SHORT FORM ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Abbott Laboratories, Abbvie Products LLC, Abbvie, Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC(Kim, Mary) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 9/15/2017 (pk, ).
September 14, 2017 Filing 6 SHORT FORM ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Abbott Laboratories, Abbvie Products LLC, Abbvie, Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC(Kim, Mary)
September 14, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbvie Products LLC, Abbvie, Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC by Mary H. Kim (Kim, Mary)
September 6, 2017 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dawn Godo, Jeffrey Godo. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Anda, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Knox, Andrew)
September 6, 2017 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dawn Godo, Jeffrey Godo. Abbott Laboratories waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Abbvie Products LLC waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Abbvie, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Besins Healthcare Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Besins Healthcare, S.A. waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017; Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 8/7/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Knox, Andrew)
June 16, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants identified in Paragraph 12 of the Master Short-Form Complaint. (kms)
June 15, 2017 MEMBER CASE OPENED from Northern District of Illinois; ( 1:17-cv-04517 Godo et al v. Abbvie, Inc. et al / Direct file in ILND). In Re: Testosterone Replacement Therapy Products Liability Litigation (MDL 2545 ) (mc, )
June 15, 2017 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (meg, )
June 15, 2017 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dawn Godo, Jeffrey Godo by Andrew W. Knox (Knox, Andrew)
June 15, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dawn Godo, Jeffrey Godo; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13282450. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knox, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godo et al v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Products LLC
Represented By: Mary H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Mary H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Joseph P Thomas
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Joseph P Thomas
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besins Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besins Healthcare, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Represented By: Mary H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Joseph P Thomas
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Mary H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Joseph P Thomas
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besins Healthcare, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Godo
Represented By: Andrew W. Knox
Represented By: Carrie R. Capouellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Godo
Represented By: Andrew W. Knox
Represented By: Carrie R. Capouellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?