Stevenson et al v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Isiah Stevenson and Michael Cokes
Defendant: City Of Chicago, Dean W Ewing, Village of Tinley Park, Tenza, Vega, Heim, Poulos, Campbell, Walker, Illinois State Police and Leo Schmitz
Case Number: 1:2017cv04839
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MOTION by Defendant Dean W Ewing for judgment as a matter of law (Barnett, Shawn)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying order and previously stated on the record, Plaintiff Arrington's motion in limine #29 is denied, and Plaintiffs' joint motion for judgment as a matter of law as to joint enterprise 360 361 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/15/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Cokes, Isiah Stevenson for judgment As a Matter of Law as to the Affirmative Defense of "Joint Enterprise" (Corrected) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Terracina, Robert)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court resolves the instant motions as follows: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. R. 201 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 278 (Ca se no. 17-cv-4839). Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. R. 199 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 276 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Defendants' motion to bar certain expert opinions is granted in part and deni ed in part. R. 220 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 299 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Plaintiffs' motion to bar expert opinions is granted in part and denied in part. R. 230 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 309 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/10/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendant City of Chicago's motion to bifurcate and stay discovery on plaintiffs' Monell claim is granted. 101 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/14/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/13/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson et al v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isiah Stevenson
Represented By: Paul Luka
Represented By: George Spataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cokes
Represented By: Paul Luka
Represented By: George Spataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: Jason Fay Cunningham
Represented By: Dana Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean W Ewing
Represented By: Maxwell Evan Lisy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Tinley Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Schmitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?