Arrington v. City of Chicago, Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Juanita Arrington
Defendant: City of Chicago, Illinois and Dean W Ewing
Case Number: 1:2017cv05345
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION by Defendant Dean W Ewing for judgment as a matter of law (Barnett, Shawn)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying order and previously stated on the record, Plaintiff Arrington's motion in limine #29 is denied, and Plaintiffs' joint motion for judgment as a matter of law as to joint enterprise 280 282 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/15/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION by Plaintiff Juanita Arrington for judgment as a matter of law as to joint enterprise (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Montgomery, James)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court resolves the instant motions as follows: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. R. 201 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 278 (Ca se no. 17-cv-4839). Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. R. 199 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 276 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Defendants' motion to bar certain expert opinions is granted in part and deni ed in part. R. 220 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 299 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Plaintiffs' motion to bar expert opinions is granted in part and denied in part. R. 230 (Case no. 17-cv-5345); R. 309 (Case no. 17-cv-4839). Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/10/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendant City of Chicago's motion to bifurcate and stay discovery on plaintiff's Monell claims is granted. 44 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/14/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the City's motion to dismiss 15 , is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/30/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. City of Chicago, Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Arrington
Represented By: James Douglas Montgomery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, Illinois
Represented By: Jason Fay Cunningham
Represented By: Liza Marie Franklin
Represented By: Dana Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean W Ewing
Represented By: Liza Marie Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?