Hardeman v. County of Lake
Plaintiff: Daniel Hardeman
Defendant: County of Lake
Case Number: 1:2017cv08729
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 4/26/2021. (ma,)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: This Court grants Plaintiff's motion for class certification 40 . The Court certifies the following sub-classes: Subclass A: all persons present in the Lake County Adult Correctional Facility between November 8, 20 17, and November 10, 2017, being held as pretrial detainees. Subclass B: all persons present in the Lake County Adult Correctional Facility between November 8, 2017, and November 10, 2017, as post-conviction inmates. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/17/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 7 is denied in part and granted in part. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/23/2018. Mailed notice. (ym, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardeman v. County of Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hardeman
Represented By: Kevin William O'Connor
Represented By: Matthew M. Popp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?