Glen Flora Dental Center, Ltd. et al v. First Eagle Bank et al
Plaintiff: Glen Flora Dental Center, Ltd., River West Smile Center, Ltd., Oral Kare Network II, Ltd., All Family Dental, Ltd., Beverly Shores Smile Center, Ltd. and Dental Practice Development, Ltd.
Defendant: First Eagle Bank, Larry Kelliher, Mikki Francione and Lenny Vihnanek
Case Number: 1:2017cv09161
Filed: December 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/17/2020. Mailed notice(gel, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/23/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/10/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glen Flora Dental Center, Ltd. et al v. First Eagle Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Flora Dental Center, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael D. Ettinger
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: James G. Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River West Smile Center, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael D. Ettinger
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: James G. Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oral Kare Network II, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael D. Ettinger
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: James G. Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Family Dental, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael D. Ettinger
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: James G. Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Shores Smile Center, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael D. Ettinger
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: James G. Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dental Practice Development, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael D. Ettinger
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: James G. Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Eagle Bank
Represented By: Steven A. Levy
Represented By: Roger Andrew Lewis
Represented By: Kerry Donovan Nelson
Represented By: William Kyle Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Kelliher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikki Francione
Represented By: Jeremy Steven Goldkind
Represented By: Christopher Niewoehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenny Vihnanek
Represented By: James E. Dahl
Represented By: Christopher J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?