Miller et al v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole and Kevin England
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00086
Filed: January 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk2, Docket)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (pj, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 6/13/2019 regarding notice of appeal #53 ; USCA No. 18-3476 ; In Miller v. Southwest Airlines, No. 18-3476, the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. In Johnson v. United Airlines, No. 19-1785, the judgment is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED with instructions to refer the parties dispute to an adjustment board. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. United and Southwest recover costs. (kp, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 5/28/2019; Decided 6/13/2019 in USCA case no. 18-3476. (kp, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 67 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 6/13/2019 regarding notice of appeal #53 ; USCA No. 18-3476 ; In Miller v. Southwest Airlines, No. 18-3476, the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. In Johnson v. United Airlines, No. 19-1785, the judgment is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED with instructions to refer the parties dispute to an adjustment board. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. United and Southwest recover costs. (kp, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 66 BILL of Costs from the USCA, appeal no. 18-3476. (kp, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 65 MANDATE of USCA dated 7/8/2019 regarding notice of appeal #53 ;USCA No.18-3476 ; No record to be returned. (kp, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to withdraw as attorney #62 is granted. Attorney Jeremiah Leon Hart terminated. Mailed notice (ags, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion by Jeremiah Leon Hart for presentment of before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/18/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Hart, Jeremiah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION by Attorney Jeremiah Hart to withdraw as attorney for Southwest Airlines Co.. No party information provided (Hart, Jeremiah)
March 5, 2019 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to withdraw as attorney #59 is granted. Attorney Bonnie Keane DelGobbo is terminated as counsel. Mailed notice (ags, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #59 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 3/7/2019 at 10:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
March 4, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION by Attorney BONNIE KEANE DELGOBBO to withdraw as attorney for Southwest Airlines Co.. No party information provided (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 58 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole (Hart, Steven)
November 21, 2018 Filing 57 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #53 ; USCA Case No. 18-3476. (smm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 56 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #53 . Notified counsel (smm, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #53 . (smm, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 54 DOCKETING Statement by Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole regarding notice of appeal #53 (Hart, Steven)
November 20, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole regarding orders #51 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-15200939. Receipt number: n (Hart, Steven)
October 25, 2018 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole by Bryce Thomas Hensley (Hensley, Bryce)
October 22, 2018 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff's motion to alter the judgment and for leave to file a second amended complaint #46 is denied. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/22/2018. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY by Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole to MOTION by Plaintiffs Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole to alter judgment and for leave to file second amended complaint #46 , Response #49 (Hart, Steven)
September 25, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. to motion to alter judgment, #46 (Siebert, Melissa)
September 17, 2018 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Defendant shall file a response to plaintiff's motion to alter judgment and for leave to file second amended complaint #46 9/25/2018; plaintiff's reply by 9/28/2018. Motion hearing date of 9/20/2018 is stricken from the Court's call. Status hearing is set for 10/25/2018 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Motion by John Shannon Marrese for presentment of motion to alter judgment, #46 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/20/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Marrese, John)
September 13, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION by Plaintiffs Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole to alter judgment and for leave to file second amended complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redlined Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clean Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Marrese, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 45 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, Defendant's motion to dismiss #27 for improper venue under Rule 12(b)(3) is granted, and Plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Johnson v. W. & S. Life Ins. Co., 598 F. App'x 454, 456 (7th Cir. 2015) ("[A] dismissal for improper venue is without prejudice because it is not an adjudication on the merits."); Farmer v. Levenson, 79 F. App'x 918, 922 (7th Cir. 2003) ("[A] dismissal for improper venue should be without prejudice."). It is so ordered. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/23/2018. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing set for 8/23/2018 is stricken and reset to 10/25/2018 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 42 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3) by Southwest Airlines Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebert, Melissa)
July 25, 2018 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing of 8/2/2018 is reset for 8/23/2018 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by Steven Alan Hart of Change of Address (Hart, Steven)
July 17, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by Brian H Eldridge of Change of Address (Eldridge, Brian)
July 17, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Robert John McLaughlin of Change of Address (McLaughlin, Robert)
July 17, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by Kyle Pozan of Change of Address (Pozan, Kyle)
July 17, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by John Shannon Marrese of Change of Address (Marrese, John)
July 5, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing of 7/12/2018 is reset for 8/2/2018 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
June 14, 2018 Filing 34 REPLY by Southwest Airlines Co. to response in opposition to motion #32 , MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(3) #27 , memorandum in support of motion #28 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siebert, Melissa)
June 6, 2018 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:The minute entry of 5/8/2018 #30 is corrected in that the status hearing of 7/12/2018 (not 7/14/2018) at 10:30 a.m. remains set.Mailed notice (mad, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Kevin Englund, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poolein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(3) #27 (Hart, Steven)
May 29, 2018 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Jeremiah Leon Hart (Hart, Jeremiah)
May 8, 2018 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Defendant's motion to dismiss #27 is stricken from the Court's call of 5/10/2018. The briefing schedule entered on 4/26/2018 #26 remains in effect. The status hearing of 7/14/2018 at 10:30 a.m. remains set.Mailed notice (mad, )
May 2, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to dismiss #27 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 5/10/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
May 2, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Southwest Airlines Co. in support of motion to dismiss #27 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(3) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Siebert, Melissa)
May 2, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(3) (Siebert, Melissa)
April 26, 2018 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion hearing held on 4/26/2018. Defendant's motion for leave to file supporting memorandum in response to the amended complaint in excess of 15 pages up to 25 pages #24 is granted. Motion to dismiss and memorandum in support are to be filed by 5/2/2018; response, of no more than 25 pages, will be due by 6/1/2018; reply, of no more than 10 pages, will be due by 6/14/2018. Status hearing of 6/7/2018 is reset for 7/12/2018 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
April 23, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #24 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/26/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Alton de Eraso, Suzanne)
April 23, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. for leave to file excess pages (Supporting Memorandumin Excess of 15 Pages) (Alton de Eraso, Suzanne)
April 23, 2018 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso (Alton de Eraso, Suzanne)
April 2, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED complaint by Jennifer Miller, Kevin England, Scott Poole against Southwest Airlines Co. (Hart, Steven)
March 21, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to strike briefing schedule on motion to dismiss and set deadline for plaintiffs to file amended complaint #18 is granted. Motion is stricken from the Court's call of 3/22/2018. Plaintiffs are to file the amended complaint by 4/2/2018. Defendant's motion to dismiss #14 is denied without prejudice and briefing schedule is stricken. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead to the forthcoming amended complaint by 5/2/2018. Status hearing of 5/10/2018 is reset for 6/7/2018 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin England, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole by John Shannon Marrese (Marrese, John)
March 5, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Alan Hart for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 3/22/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Hart, Steven)
March 5, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiffs Kevin England, Jennifer Miller, Scott PooleUNOPPOSED Motion to Strike Briefing Schedule and Set Deadline for Amended Complaint (Hart, Steven)
February 15, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Response to defendant's motion to dismiss #14 due by 3/9/2018; reply due by 3/19/2018. Motion is stricken from the Court's call of 2/22/2018. Status hearing of 3/22/2018 is reset for 5/10/2018 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 2/22/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
February 12, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Southwest Airlines Co. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siebert, Melissa)
February 12, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Siebert, Melissa)
January 11, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin England, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole by Antonio Maurizio Romanucci (Romanucci, Antonio)
January 10, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Defendant's motion for extension of time to 2/12/2018 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #10 is granted. Motion is stricken from the Court's call of 1/11/2018. Status hearing is set for 3/22/2018 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
January 8, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/11/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
January 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint (Unopposed) (Hines, Erin)
January 5, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin England, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole by Kyle Pozan (Pozan, Kyle)
January 5, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin England, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole by Robert John McLaughlin (McLaughlin, Robert)
January 5, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin England, Jennifer Miller, Scott Poole by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven)
January 5, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (meg, )
January 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Southwest Airlines Co. (Hines, Erin)
January 5, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
January 5, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
January 5, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Erin Bolan Hines (Hines, Erin)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hines, Erin)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2017ch15621) filed by Southwest Airlines Co. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13970316. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Hines, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miller
Represented By: Brian H Eldridge
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Represented By: Robert John McLaughlin
Represented By: Kyle Pozan
Represented By: Antonio Maurizio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Poole
Represented By: Brian H Eldridge
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Represented By: Robert John McLaughlin
Represented By: Kyle Pozan
Represented By: Antonio Maurizio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin England
Represented By: Brian H Eldridge
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Represented By: Robert John McLaughlin
Represented By: Kyle Pozan
Represented By: Antonio Maurizio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Erin Bolan Hines
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?