Tri-State Disposal, Inc. v. The Village of Riverdale et al
Plaintiff: |
Tri-State Disposal, Inc. |
Defendant: |
The Village of Riverdale, The Village of Riverdale Board of Trustees, Lawrence J Jackson, Roderick Jefferson, Cassandra Riley-Pinkney, Gregory Lewis, Brenda Williams, Erik Levere and Bradley Smith |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv02138 |
Filed: |
March 23, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Sara L. Ellis |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 27, 2022 |
Filing
194
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Opinion and Order, the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment 166 and enters judgment for Defendants on Tri-State's third amended complaint. Further, the Court denies Tri-State's motion to strike 190 . Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/27/2022:Mailed notice(rj, )
|
September 21, 2020 |
Filing
82
OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/21/2020. Mailed notice(rj, )
|
January 28, 2020 |
Filing
67
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss 57 . The Court dismisses Counts I and II with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/28/2020.Mailed notice(sxw, )
|
March 26, 2019 |
Filing
45
OPINION AND ORDER. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to dismiss 25 . The Court dismisses Tri-State's due process claims without prejudice and its equal protection claim and common law certiorari claim with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/26/2019. Mailed notice(rj, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Tri-State Disposal, Inc. v. The Village of Riverdale et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Tri-State Disposal, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Marissa Renee Alaska |
Represented By: |
David Jonathan Aron |
Represented By: |
Mark Anthony LaRose |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: The Village of Riverdale |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: The Village of Riverdale Board of Trustees |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Lawrence J Jackson |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Roderick Jefferson |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Cassandra Riley-Pinkney |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Gregory Lewis |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brenda Williams |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Erik Levere |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bradley Smith |
Represented By: |
Erin Elizabeth Blake |
Represented By: |
Richard F. Bruen, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Wise |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?