Premium Express, Inc. v. King's Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Premium Express, Inc.
Defendant: Dennis McCormick, Infinity Logistics, Inc. and King's Express, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02141
Filed: March 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Kane
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 42 PARTIAL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding entered judgment #17 in the amount of $145,838.75 as to King's Express, Inc. and Dennis McCormick (Barrette, Matthew)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/24/2018.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the answer of third party citation respondent and turnover of funds #38 is granted, as modified. Enter order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Paul Barrette for presentment of motion for judgment #38 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/24/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Barrette, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. for judgment on the Answer of Third Party Citation Respondent and Turnover of Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Barrette, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff failed to appear. Plaintiff's motion for judgment #35 is denied without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Paul Barrette for presentment of motion for judgment #35 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/16/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Barrette, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. for judgment on the Answer of Third Party Citation Respondent and for Turnover of Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Barrette, Matthew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 34 ANSWER of Third Party Respondent Citation by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (eaa, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Citation hearing set for 9/27/2018 #31 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. regarding Citation to Discover Assets to Third Party served on Tyler Rundle of Wells Fargo Bank NA on September 6, 2018 (Barrette, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of Plaintiff, the citation hearing set for 8/29/2018 #26 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. regarding Citation to Discover Assets to Third Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on Tyler Rundle of Wells Fargo Bank on August 9, 2018 (Mahoney, Ryan)
August 8, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by Premium Express, Inc. of Citation to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Barrette, Matthew)
August 8, 2018 Filing 24 Turnover Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/8/2018.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the answer of third party citation respondent and turnover of funds #19 is granted. Enter turnover order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER of Third Party Respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Citation. (ek, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER of Third Party Respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Citation(ek, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Paul Barrette for presentment of motion for judgment #19 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/8/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Barrette, Matthew)
August 2, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. for judgment on the Answer of Third Party Citation Respondent and for Turnover of Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Barrette, Matthew)
July 24, 2018 Filing 18 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(cc, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 17 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 7/17/2018.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. Motion for default judgment #14 is granted. Enter judgment order. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Paul Barrette for presentment of motion for default judgment, #14 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/17/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Barrette, Matthew)
July 10, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. for default judgment as to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 4A, #6 Exhibit 4B, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 5A)(Barrette, Matthew)
June 27, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/17/2018 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, a Civil Rule 55(a) default is entered against Defendants Kings Express, Inc., Infinity Logistics, Inc., and Dennis McCormick. A Civil Rule 55(b) prove-up hearing is set for 7/17/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file its Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment by 7/10/2018. If the any Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiffs forthcoming Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment, that Defendant must file a written opposition by 7/16/2018 or appear at the 7/17/2018 hearing. If Defendant does not respond or appear, the court will rule on the papers at the 7/17/2018 hearing. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with a copy of this order and its Rule 55(b) papers via a means that allows for electronic confirmation of delivery.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Express, Inc. as to Dennis McCormick on 5/29/2018, answer due 6/19/2018. (Barrette, Matthew)
June 6, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Express, Inc. as to Infinity Logistics, Inc. on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Barrette, Matthew)
June 6, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Express, Inc. as to King's Express, Inc. on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Barrette, Matthew)
June 1, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Because the docket does not indicate that summonses have been served, the status hearing set for 6/6/2018 #8 is stricken and re-set for 6/27/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 30, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Because the docket does not indicate that summonses have been served, status hearing set for 5/3/2018 #7 is stricken and re-set for 6/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/3/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
March 26, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Infinity Logistics, Inc., King's Express, Inc., Dennis McCormick. (kms)
March 23, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (meg, )
March 23, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barrette, Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. by Ryan Arthur Mahoney (Mahoney, Ryan)
March 23, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Premium Express, Inc. by Matthew Paul Barrette (Barrette, Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Premium Express, Inc. (Barrette, Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Premium Express, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14273961. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Barrette, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premium Express, Inc. v. King's Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King's Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premium Express, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Paul Barrette
Represented By: Ryan Arthur Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?