BASI v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: SHARANJIT BASI
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen Nielsen, Acting Director of F David Bowdich, Thomas M Cioppa and David Bowdich
Case Number: 1:2018cv02685
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing set for 7/23/2018 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 19, 2018 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Odeh, Reem)
June 15, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held. Status hearing set for 7/23/18 at 9:30 a.m. to allow the parties additional time to resolve the issues. The Government's responsive pleading is due on or before 7/23/18 if a resolution can not be reached prior to the next status. Mailed notice (ep, )
June 13, 2018 5 STATUS Report by David Bowdich, Thomas M Cioppa, Kirstjen Nielsen (Oswald, Craig)
May 18, 2018 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. Status hearing set for 6/15/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 19, 2018 3 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Thomas M Cioppa, Kirstjen Nielsen (Oswald, Craig)
April 16, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to David Bowdich, Thomas M Cioppa, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (mma, )
April 16, 2018 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
April 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (kb, )
April 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by SHARANJIT BASI; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14350970. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Odeh, Reem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASI v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of F David Bowdich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M Cioppa
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bowdich
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARANJIT BASI
Represented By: Reem H Odeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?