Hayes Sr v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Hayes Sr
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., US Secretary of Veteran Affairs and American Modern Home Insurance Group
Case Number: 1:2018cv03449
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 43 RETURN by U.S. Marshal Service regarding summons: The U.S. Marshal Service is unable to execute services without the USM 285 form. (kp, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Order entered 1/28/2019 #41 is vacated.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Order entered 1/8/2019 #39 is vacated.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 38 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/8/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Chambers has been informed that Plaintiff did not return the USM-285 form with an updated address for Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. Accordingly, pursuant to the 11/28/2018 order #34 , the claims against Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice for want of prosecution. This disposes of all claims against all Defendants. Enter judgment order. Status hearing set for 1/9/2019 #34 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The 12/26/2018 stay order #35 is vacated because no federal parties remain in this case.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, )
November 30, 2018 MAILED a new USM-285 form and a copy of the minute entry dated 11/28/2018 to plaintiff Ramon Hayes Sr. (sxb, )
November 30, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued, certified copy of minute entry dated 11/28/2018 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. via email. (sxb, ) Modified on 11/30/2018 (sxb, ).
November 28, 2018 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company's converted motion for summary judgment #17 is granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate American Modern Home Insurance Company is terminated as a party defendant. It would appear that Plaintiff provided the incorrect address on the USM-285 form for Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. #12 . The Clerk is directed to issue alias summons for Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. and to send Mr. Hayes a new USM-285 from. Mr. Hayes shall complete the USM-285 form with an updated address for Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., and return that form to the Clerk by 12/18/2018. Once that form is returned to the Clerk, the U.S. Marshals Service is appointed to effect service on that defendant. If Plaintiff fails to comply, his claims against Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. will be dismissed with prejudice for want of prosecution.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 12, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY by Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Group to memorandum in support of motion, #18 , other #32 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 (Friebus, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 32 Local Rule 56.2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant Opposing Motion for Summary Judgment by American Modern Home Insurance Group (Friebus, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement of the moving party #30 , Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company's motion to dismiss #17 is converted to a summary judgment motion pursuant to Civil Rule 12(d). Defendant American Home Insurance Company shall file a Local Rule 56.2 Notice (except for the paragraph addressing Local Rule 56.1) and serve it on Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall respond to the summary judgment motion by 10/22/2018; Defendant's reply due by 11/12/2018. Status hearing set for 9/25/2018 #29 is stricken and re-set for 11/28/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 30 STATEMENT by American Modern Home Insurance Group on Motion to Dismiss (Friebus, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 9/25/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company's motion to dismiss #17 is entered and continued. Defendant's motion to defer deadline to file answer #20 is granted. Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company's obligation to answer is deferred pending further order of court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #26 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Group by David Michael Friebus (Friebus, David)
September 6, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14913881. (Tucker, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 25 [Amended Notice of Motion to Defer Deadline to File an Answer] NOTICE of Motion by Mark Alan Johnson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #20 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Johnson, Mark)
September 5, 2018 Filing 24 [Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss] NOTICE of Motion by Mark Alan Johnson for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Group by Mark Alan Johnson (Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Modern Home Insurance Group (Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by American Modern Home Insurance Group in support of motion for extension of time to file answer #20 [Memorandum in Support of Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company's Motion to Defer Deadline to File an Answer] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Group for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #10 [Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company's Motion to Defer Deadline to File an Answer] (Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 [Notice of Motion to Defer Deadline to File an Answer of Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company] NOTICE of Motion by Mark Alan Johnson for presentment of (Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by American Modern Home Insurance Group in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 [Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit C-1)(Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Group (Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 16 [Notice of Motion to Dismiss of Defendant American Modern Home Insurance Company] NOTICE of Motion by Mark Alan Johnson for presentment of (Johnson, Mark)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/10/2018 #14 is stricken and re-set for 9/11/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 8/23/2018 #9 is stricken and re-set for 9/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to American Modern Home Insurance Group waiver sent on 7/5/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (jk, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by U.S. Marshals Service as to Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. (jk, )
June 25, 2018 SUMMONS Issued along with USM 285 form(s), certified copy of order dated 06/22/2018 #10 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendants American Modern Home Insurance Group, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. via email. (jk, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 10 COMPLAINT filed by Ramon Hayes Sr; Jury Demand. (jk, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Motion for attorney representation #5 is denied without prejudice. This case is in its infancy, and Plaintiff has not made sufficient efforts (contacting only one lawyer is insufficient) to obtain representation on his own. The claims against US Secretary of Veteran Affairs is dismissed, as the complaint does not state a plausible claim against the Secretary. The Clerk is directed to terminate US Secretary of Veteran Affairs as a party defendant and to make Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. the lead defendant for purposes of the caption. The Clerk is further directed to issue summonses for service on Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., and American Modern Home Insurance Company, and to forward the summonses and USM-285 forms for those two defendants 6 to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Marshals Service is appointed to effect service on the two remaining defendants. Status hearing set for 8/23/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to appear at court hearings could lead to the dismissal of this case with prejudice for want of prosecution.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Ramon Hayes Sr for attorney representation. (mc, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ramon Hayes Sr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (mc, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ramon Hayes Sr (mc, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (mc, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 3 copies by Ramon Hayes Sr. (mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes Sr v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Secretary of Veteran Affairs
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Home Insurance Group
Represented By: David Michael Friebus
Represented By: Robert James Tucker
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Hayes Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?