In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Eric Levy Roth IRA, LRI Invest S.A., Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated, FTC Capital GMBH, Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated, Haldeman Realty Co., Inc., William Tad Berger, Tony Elich, Nathan L. Terwilliger, David Samuel, Spencer Roland Bueno, Amy Huang, Thomas J. Sanduski, Corey Burnell, Christopher Musso, Robert Etten, Victor Choa, William Siegel, Cassandra Trading Group, LLC, John Pels, Susan Koza, Dale Cary, Brian Barry, Alex Palatiello, Gary M. Beck, Breakwater Trading LLC, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, Jeffery Tomasulo, David Quint, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC and Richard S. Aaron
Defendant: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation, Citigroup Financial Products Inc, John Does 1-50, CBOE Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Board Options Exchange Inc., Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc., Wolverine Trading L.P., John Does 1-20, CTC, LLC, Chicago Board of Options Exchange, Inc., Citigroup Market Derivatives, Inc., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc, CBOE Exchange, Inc., DRW Holdings, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, Wolverine Trading LLC, John Does, IMC Financial Markets LLC, Consolidated Trading, LLC, John Does 1-10, CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, Belvedere Trading, LLC. and Citadel Securities
Respondent: LJM Partners, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04171
Filed: June 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 297 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to file response/reply #295 is granted. Cboe's responses are now due 3/13/20. Plaintiffs' replies are due 3/20/20. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 296 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory M. Boyle for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #295 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Boyle, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Filing 295 MOTION by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b), #290 , motion to expedite #294 , motion for discovery, #292 (Unopposed) (Boyle, Gregory)
February 20, 2020 Filing 294 MOTION by Respondent LJM Partners, Ltd. to expedite discovery and memorandum of law in support filed jointly with Two Roads Shared Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Cortazar, Ryan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 293 MEMORANDUM by Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) in support of motion for discovery, #292 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bunge, Jonathan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 292 MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel for discovery to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference (Bunge, Jonathan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM by Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) in support of motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b), #290 (Bunge, Jonathan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 290 MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) (Bunge, Jonathan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 289 PETITION Joint Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel (Bunge, Jonathan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 288 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/06/2020 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 37780. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312)435-5885, on behalf of Mary Hacker. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2020. (Scarpelli, Rosemary)
February 6, 2020 Filing 287 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' motions for Rule 54 judgment and for leave to pursue discovery to identify the Doe defendants is due 2/20/20. Defendants' responses are due 3/5/20; plaintiffs' replies 3/12/20. Case No. 20 C 831, Two Roads Shared Trust v. Does, shall be submitted to the Executive Committee for reassignment before this court. LJM Partners (19 C 368) and Two Roads Shared Trust's motions for discovery to identify the Doe defendants in those cases is also due 2/20/20; with defendants' responses due 3/5/20; plaintiffs' replies due 3/12/20. The terms of the existing leadership structure are extended to 2/28/20. Proposals for new or renewed leadership structure are due 2/20/20. The court will enter a responsive order. Continued status hearing is set for 4/9/20 at 10:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/27/2020: Cboe's motion to dismiss, #273 , is granted. All counts against Cboe are dismissed with prejudice. A status hearing is set for February 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. [For further detail see attached order.] Non-lead counsel may listen to the proceedings on February 6, 2020 by dialing 888-204-5984 and using the access code: 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 285 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #283 is granted. Brian Morrison is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 284 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory Asciolla for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #283 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/21/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Asciolla, Gregory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 283 MOTION by Attorney Brian Morrison to withdraw as attorney for Amy Huang. No party information provided (Asciolla, Gregory)
November 4, 2019 Filing 282 REPLY by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion, #281 / Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of CBOE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Schar, Reid)
October 8, 2019 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM by Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #273 (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Bunge, Jonathan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 280 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #278 is granted, and David Allan Geiger is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #220 #275 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 279 NOTICE of Motion by David Allan Geiger for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #278 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Geiger, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 278 MOTION by Attorney David A. Geiger to withdraw as attorney for Wolverine Trading L.P., Wolverine Trading LLC. No party information provided (Geiger, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 277 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by Eamon O'Kelly (O'Kelly, Eamon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 276 WITHDRAWING William V. Reiss as counsel for Plaintiff Brian Barry and substituting Eamon O'Kelly as counsel of record (O'Kelly, Eamon)
September 4, 2019 Filing 275 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16203526. (Metcalf, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 274 MEMORANDUM by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #273 (Schar, Reid)
August 28, 2019 Filing 273 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. (Schar, Reid)
August 23, 2019 Filing 272 DECLARATION of Spencer Roland Bueno / Amended Certification of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws (Bunge, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 271 CORRECTED AMENDED complaint by Victor Choa, Dale Cary, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Richard S. Aaron, William Tad Berger, FTC Capital GMBH, Brian Barry, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, Amy Huang, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Spencer Roland Bueno against CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. (Bunge, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 270 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiffs have leave to file a corrected amended complaint. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER : The motion for expedited discovery in LJM Partners, Ltd. v. Does, 19 CV 368 (N.D. Ill) #23 , is denied. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/12/19. [For further details see order].Mailed notice(ca, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER RENEWING PLAINTIFF'S LEADERSHIP COUNCIL FOR SIX MONTHS. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/8/2019. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 267 PETITION Application to Appoint Sharan Nirmul as Co-Lead Counsel (Nirmul, Sharan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 266 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Any additional applications to revise plaintiffs' leadership structure shall be filed by 8/7/19. The current structure of co-lead counsel and the steering committee shall remain in place while any applications are pending. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 265 PETITION Joint Application for Re-Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel (Bunge, Jonathan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 264 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victor Choa by Manuel Juan Dominguez (Dominguez, Manuel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 263 AMENDED complaint by Victor Choa, Dale Cary, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, William Tad Berger, FTC Capital GMBH, Brian Barry, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, Amy Huang, Spencer Roland Bueno, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Richard S. Aaron against CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bunge, Jonathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/16/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 35444. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, OCR, colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov or 312.435.5594. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 261 REPLY by In Re Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation Reply Memorandum in Support of LJM's Motion for Expedited Discovery (Cortazar, Ryan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 260 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Defendants' motion to dismiss or answer is due 8/28/19. Plaintiff's response to any motion to dismiss is due 10/8/19; defendants' reply 11/4/19. The court will issue a ruling on the motion to dismiss and LJM's motion to expedite discovery #253 via cm/ecf, in which any further dates shall be set. Notices mailed.
July 2, 2019 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. in Opposition to motion to expedite #253 (Boyle, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06/25/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 35166. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, OCR, colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov or 312.435.5594. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 257 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. The briefing schedule on LJM Partners, Ltd.'s motion to expedite discovery #253 is as follows: Cboe shall respond by 7/2/19; LJM's reply is due 7/16/19. Status hearing remains set for 7/16/19 at 9:30 a.m. Non-lead counsel may listen to the proceedings by dialing 888-204-5984 and using the access code: 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 256 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Non-lead counsel may listen to the proceedings in this matter set for 6/25/19 at 9:45 a.m. by dialing 888-204-5984, and using access code 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 255 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent LJM Partners, Ltd. by Ryan Z. Cortazar (Cortazar, Ryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 254 NOTICE of Motion by Chad Emerson Bell for presentment of motion to expedite #253 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bell, Chad)
June 18, 2019 Filing 253 MOTION by Respondent LJM Partners, Ltd. to expedite Discovery and Memorandum of Law in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Document Requests)(Bell, Chad)
June 12, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE by Kyle Alan Shamberg of Change of Address (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation) (Shamberg, Kyle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 251 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to file consolidated amended class action complaint #248 is granted, and the amended complaint is now due 7/19/19. The motion to withdraw as attorney #246 is granted. Elizabeth A. Fegan is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motions is necessary. Status hearing on 6/14/19 is stricken and reset to 7/16/19 at 9:30 a.m. Non-lead counsel may listen to the proceedings by dialing 888-204-5984 and using the access code: 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE by Katrina Carroll of Change of Address (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation) (Carroll, Katrina)
June 5, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of extension of time, #248 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/13/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 248 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel for extension of time to file the consolidated amended class action complaint (Bunge, Jonathan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 247 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth A. Fegan for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #246 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 246 MOTION by Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan to withdraw as attorney for Nathan L. Terwilliger. No party information provided (Fegan, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 245 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/29/2019: Defendants' motion to dismiss #184 is granted. Plaintiffs' negligence claim is dismissed with prejudice, but the other claims are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to file an amended complaint. Any amended complaint must be filed by June 19, 2019, and a status hearing is set for June 14, 2019 at 9:45 a.m. Non-lead counsel may listen to the proceedings by dialing 888-204-5984 and using the access code: 9146677. [For further detail, see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 244 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #242 is granted. Anna Marie Horning Nygren is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE of Motion by Anna Marie Horning Nygren for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #242 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/14/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Horning Nygren, Anna)
May 3, 2019 Filing 242 MOTION by Attorney Anna M. Horning Nygren to withdraw as attorney for Haldeman Realty Co., Inc.. No party information provided (Horning Nygren, Anna)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/16/2019: The motion to modify the order appointing plaintiffs' leadership counsel #226 is granted in limited part. Ms. Justice will remain co-lead counsel for now, but Sharan Nirmul, Kessler Topaz, is immediately appointed to plaintiffs' steering committee to allow for continuity of assignments and to allow the Kessler Topaz clients to have a role in directing the case. Mr. Nirmul's appointment will expire, along with all other appointments, on August 1, 2019. See #119 . Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 240 NOTICE by Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) of Position Regarding Motion of Plaintiffs William Tad Berger, Dale Cary, and David Samuel to Modify the Court's August 16, 2018 Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel (Bunge, Jonathan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 239 REPLY by Plaintiffs William Tad Berger, Dale Cary, David Samuel to motion for miscellaneous relief #226 to Modify the Court's August 16, 2018 Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nirmul, Sharan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #233 is granted. David K. Suska is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 237 RESPONSE by Robert Ettenin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs William Tad Berger, Dale Cary, David Samuelto Modify the Court's August 16, 2018 Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel #226 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Justice, Kimberly)
April 10, 2019 Filing 236 Notice of Support for the Retention of Kimberly A. Justice by John Pels (Frederick, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 235 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Etten by Kimberly A. Justice (Justice, Kimberly)
April 8, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE of Motion by David K. Suska for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #233 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/18/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Suska, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 233 MOTION by Attorney David K. Suska to withdraw as attorney for John Pels. No party information provided (Suska, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/04/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 34265. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 230 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by Kimberly A. Justice (Justice, Kimberly)
April 3, 2019 Filing 229 NOTICE by Kimberly A. Justice of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation (Justice, Kimberly)
April 3, 2019 Filing 228 MEMORANDUM by William Tad Berger, Dale Cary, David Samuel in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #226 (Nirmul, Sharan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE of Motion by Sharan Nirmul for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #226 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Nirmul, Sharan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 226 MOTION by Plaintiffs William Tad Berger, Dale Cary, David Samuelto Modify the Court's August 16, 2018 Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel (Nirmul, Sharan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 4/4/19 at 11:15 a.m. Reid Schar and Kimberly Justice may appear by telephone by dialing: 888-204-5984, and using access code: 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 224 Letter by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. to the Honorable Manish S. Shah dated 04/02/2019 (Schar, Reid)
March 28, 2019 Filing 223 Letter by Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) Regarding Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bunge, Jonathan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 222 PAYMENT by David Quint of Pro Hac Fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15629630. (Brody, Aaron)
March 20, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #220 (ew, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 220 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff David Quint by Aaron L Brody (Brody, Aaron) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office) (ew, ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 219 MOTION by Attorney Michael J. Klein to withdraw as attorney for David Quint. No party information provided (Klein, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 218 MOTION by Attorney Thomas Popejoy to withdraw as attorney for Spencer Roland Bueno. No party information provided (Popejoy, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER and Statement. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/1/2019. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The Clerk shall designate Case Number 19 CV 0368 as consolidated with In Re Chicago Board Options Exchange VIX Manipulation Antitrust Litigation, based on its status as a tag-along action. Notwithstanding this designation, LJM Partners v. Does, 19 CV 0368, will be treated as a separate action (a separate complaint with separate plaintiff's counsel) for now. Discovery will be coordinated with the VIX MDL. Any filings related to 19 CV 368 should be filed in both 18 CV 4171 and 19 CV 0368. Enter order. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 215 RESPONSE by Respondent LJM Partners, Ltd. to text entry, #210 Position Paper of LJM Partners, Ltd. regarding Coordination with the Multidistrict Litigation (Bell, Chad)
February 26, 2019 Filing 214 RESPONSE by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. to text entry, #210 / Cboe's Response to February 12, 2019 Order (Schar, Reid)
February 26, 2019 Filing 213 Plaintiffs' Position on Coordination by Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Bunge, Jonathan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15497644. (Jarvis, Geoffrey)
February 15, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE by Michelle C. Clerkin of Change of Address (Clerkin, Michelle)
February 12, 2019 Filing 210 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Any position papers regarding whether and how case no. 19-cv-00368, LJM Partners, Ltd. v. Does, and any other potential similar actions that may be filed, should be coordinated with this MDL shall be submitted by 2/26/19. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 209 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/06/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 33632, 33640. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 208 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: the minute entry dated 2/6/19 is amended to read LJM Partners, Ltd. v. Does, 19-cv-368 shall be submitted to the Executive Committee for reassignment to Judge Shah. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. The court has considered LJM Partners, Ltd.'s response to the motion to reassign #206 . The motion to reassign #198 is granted. Although it is too early in either case to know whether they are susceptible to disposition in a single proceeding under Local Rule 40.4(b)(4), Judges Kendall and Shah have agreed, pursuant to Internal Operating Procedure 13(d) that LJM Partners, Ltd. v. Does, 19-cv-348, shall be submitted to the Executive Committee for reassignment to Judge Shah. There is sufficient overlap in the factual allegations to enable more efficient administration of the cases if supervised by a single judge. Upon reassignment, LJM Partners may re-notice its motion for early discovery before Judge Shah. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 206 RESPONSE by LJM Partners, Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. to reassign case #198 (Bell, Chad)
February 1, 2019 Filing 205 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #200 is granted. Steven Alan Hart and John Shannon Marrese are terminated as counsel of record. The Clerk is directed to remove these attorneys from the ECF email notifications for this case. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 204 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By agreement of the parties, the 2/1/19 hearing on plaintiff's motion to reassign #198 is stricken and reset to 2/6/19 at 9:45 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 203 REPLY by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion, #192 / Reply in Support of CBOE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Schar, Reid)
January 28, 2019 Filing 202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The court will be closed on 1/30/19 due to severe weather. Hearing on plaintiff's motion #198 on 1/30/19 is stricken and reset to 2/1/19 at 9:45 a.m. The parties may email susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule that date, if necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Alan Hart for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #200 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hart, Steven)
January 28, 2019 Filing 200 MOTION by Attorney Steven A. Hart and John M. Marrese to withdraw as attorney for Brian Barry. No party information provided (Hart, Steven)
January 25, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE of Motion by Reid J Schar for presentment of motion to reassign case #198 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Schar, Reid)
January 25, 2019 Filing 198 MOTION by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Boyle, Gregory)
January 19, 2019 Filing 197 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw #193 is granted. Times Wang is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, the motion for expedited discovery and to partially modify the PSLRA discovery stay #165 is denied, without prejudice. The court will issue an order with further court dates once the motion to dismiss #184 is fully briefed. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/11/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 33373. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
January 7, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Fata for presentment of motion to withdraw #193 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Fata, Anthony)
January 7, 2019 Filing 193 MOTION by Plaintiff Atlantic Trading USA, LLC to withdraw Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Times Wang (Fata, Anthony)
January 7, 2019 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM by Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #184 (Bunge, Jonathan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for January 11, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. The court would like to discuss the motion for discovery with the parties, including whether plaintiffs could fashion narrower discovery requests that do not require production of trading activity that is not alleged to be manipulative or unlawful. Non-lead counsel may listen to the proceedings by dialing 888-204-5984 and using the access code: 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 190 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #188 is granted. Zachary P. Arbitman is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 189 NOTICE of Motion by Kimberly A. Justice for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #188 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/11/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Justice, Kimberly)
December 5, 2018 Filing 188 MOTION by Attorney Zachary Arbitman to withdraw as attorney for Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel. No party information provided (Justice, Kimberly)
December 4, 2018 Filing 187 REPLY by Plaintiffs Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel to motion for discovery,, #165 Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery and to Partially Modify the PSLRA Discovery Stay (Bunge, Jonathan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 186 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cassandra Trading Group, LLC (Millen, Douglas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #184 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schar, Reid)
November 19, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. (Schar, Reid)
November 16, 2018 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. in Opposition to motion for discovery,, #165 - Cboe's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (Schar, Reid)
November 14, 2018 Filing 182 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #179 is granted. Zachary Jayson Ziliak is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE of Service for Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Motion (Ziliak, Zachary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE of Motion by Zachary Jayson Ziliak for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #179 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Ziliak, Zachary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 179 MOTION by Attorney Zachary J. Ziliak to withdraw as attorney for Amy Huang. No party information provided (Ziliak, Zachary)
November 9, 2018 Filing 178 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw from Plaintiffs' Steering Committee #175 is granted. Erin Durba is withdrawn from the committee and Michelle C. Clerkin is appointed to the committee. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #174 is granted. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Durba for presentment of motion to withdraw, #175 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/13/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Durba, Erin)
November 6, 2018 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM by FTC Capital GMBH, LRI Invest S.A. in support of motion to withdraw, #175 (Durba, Erin)
November 6, 2018 Filing 175 MOTION by Plaintiffs FTC Capital GMBH, LRI Invest S.A. to withdraw Uncontested Motion by Erin C. Durba to Withdraw from Plaintiffs Steering Committee and by FTC Capital GmbH and LRI Invest S.A. to Appoint Michelle C. Clerkin to Plaintiffs Steering Committee (Durba, Erin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 174 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15136707. (Clerkin, Michelle)
November 2, 2018 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/01/18 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 32682, 32683. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. Defendants' response to plaintiffs' motion for discovery #165 is due by 11/16/18. Plaintiffs' reply is due by 12/7/18. The court will issue a ruling via cm/ecf. Notices mailed. (jk, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Hearing set for 11/1/18 on plaintiffs' motion for discovery #165 is reset to 10:45 a.m. Please note, this is only a change of time. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #170 is granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15113568. (Joshua, D''Ancona)
October 26, 2018 Filing 169 DECLARATION of LRI Invest S.A. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 168 DECLARATION of FTC Capital GmbH (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE by Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) of Named Plaintiffs' Certifications Pursuant to Federal Security Laws (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 25, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE by Carl V. Malmstrom of Change of Address (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 25, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION by Plaintiffs Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Brian Barry, Gary M. Beck, William Tad Berger, Breakwater Trading LLC, Spencer Roland Bueno, Corey Burnell, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, Tony Elich, Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Eric Levy Roth IRA, Robert Etten, FTC Capital GMBH, Haldeman Realty Co., Inc., Amy Huang, Susan Koza, LRI Invest S.A., Christopher Musso, Alex Palatiello, John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Quint, David Samuel, David Samuel, Thomas J. Sanduski, William Siegel, Nathan L. Terwilliger, Jeffery Tomasulo for discovery and to Partially Modify the PSLRA Discovery Stay (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery and to Partially Modify The PSLRA Discovery Stay (Related to Dkt. 163) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bunge, Jonathan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 163 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/1/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 162 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by 11/19/18. Plaintiffs' response is due by 1/7/19. Defendants' reply is due by 1/28/19. The opening and response briefs may be up to 60 pages; the reply brief may be up to 30 pages. Notices mailed. (lf, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 161 STATUS Report / Joint Status Report in Response to the Court's September 7, 2018 Order by CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. (Schar, Reid)
October 4, 2018 Filing 160 NOTICE by Steve W. Berman of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berman, Steve)
October 1, 2018 Filing 159 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Consolidated Trading, LLC (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 158 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Citigroup Financial Products Inc. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 157 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 156 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Citadel Securities LLC (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 155 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Wolverine Trading LLC (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 154 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Wolverine Trading L.P. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 153 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant IMC Financial Markets LLC (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 152 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant DRW Holdings, LLC (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 151 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant CTC, LLC (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 150 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Projection Capital Markets LLC (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 148 DECLARATION of John Pels (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 147 DECLARATION of LRI Invest S.A. (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Amy Huang (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Victor Choa (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Dale Carey (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 143 DECLARATION of Spencer Roland Bueno (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 142 DECLARATION of William Tad Berger (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 141 DECLARATION of Brian Barry (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 140 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AMENDED complaint by Dale Cary, John Pels, FTC Capital GMBH, Brian Barry, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, Amy Huang, Spencer Roland Bueno, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), William Tad Berger, Victor Choa, LRI Invest S.A. against CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc., Chicago Board of Options Exchange, Inc. (Bunge, Jonathan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #135 is granted. Michael J. Nicoud is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary M. Beck Without Prejudice (Brandt, Derek)
September 7, 2018 Filing 137 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. By 10/5/18, the parties shall file a joint status report with a proposed briefing schedule for any forthcoming motions to dismiss and/or a proposed deadline for answers. If there are competing proposals, they may be presented in the single joint report. The court will enter a responsive order setting any further dates and deadlines. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE of Motion by George Carlos Aguilar for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #135 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Aguilar, George)
September 6, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION by Attorney Michael J. Nicoud to withdraw as attorney for Corey Burnell. No party information provided (Aguilar, George)
September 6, 2018 Filing 134 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Siegel by Jeanette Bayoumi (Bayoumi, Jeanette)
September 6, 2018 Filing 133 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Siegel by Hilary K. Scherrer (Scherrer, Hilary)
September 4, 2018 Filing 132 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DRW Holdings, LLC by Jonathan David Cogan (Cogan, Jonathan)
August 31, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffery Tomasulo Without Prejudice (Zelcs, George)
August 31, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Breakwater Trading LLC Without Prejudice (Zelcs, George)
August 31, 2018 Filing 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #121 , #123 , #126 , #127 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #124 is granted. The consolidated master amended complaint shall be filed by 9/28/18. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Status hearing remains set for 9/7/18 at 11:30 a.m. Non-lead counsel may listen to the proceedings by dialing 888-204-5984 and using the access code: 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14889470. (Cogan, Jonathan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 126 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14887051. (Kaplan, Stacey)
August 28, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of extension of time #124 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/4/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION by Plaintiffs Spencer Roland Bueno, David Samuel for extension of time to file the Consolidated Master Amended Complaint (Bunge, Jonathan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14877545. (Bayoumi, Jeanette)
August 22, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE by Michael C Dell'Angelo of Change of Address (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14849890. (Durba, Erin)
August 16, 2018 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM Accompanying Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/16/2018: A consolidated master amended complaint is due September 14, 2018, and a status hearing is set for September 7, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. The clerk shall make arrangements for non-lead counsel to listen to the proceedings by phone. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Appointing Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/16/2018. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 118 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #111 #112 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 117 REPLY by Plaintiff Atlantic Trading USA, LLC to Response, #105 THE C+C FIRMS REPLY TO HAGENS BERMANS CONFLICT ARGUMENT (Fata, Anthony)
August 3, 2018 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah:Plaintiff Atlantic Trading USA, LLC's motion for leave to file reply #114 is granted and no appearance on the motion is necessary. No additional briefing is permitted or necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Fata for presentment of motion for leave to file #114 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/8/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Fata, Anthony)
August 3, 2018 Filing 114 MOTION by Plaintiff Atlantic Trading USA, LLC for leave to file THE C+C FIRMS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THREE-PAGE REPLY TO HAGENS BERMANS NEW CONFLICT ARGUMENT (Fata, Anthony)
August 3, 2018 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The status hearing on 8/8/18 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. The court appreciates the submissions of the parties and has no questions for counsel. An order resolving the applications for leadership role will issue within two weeks. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14777554. (Aguilar, George)
August 3, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14777483. (Nicoud, Michael)
August 2, 2018 Filing 110 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Brian Barry, Gary M. Beck, Breakwater Trading LLC, Tony Elich, Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Eric Levy Roth IRA, Robert Etten, Haldeman Realty Co., Inc., Susan Koza, Christopher Musso, Alex Palatiello, John Pels, David Quint, David Samuel, Thomas J. Sanduski, William Siegel, Jeffery Tomasulo Corrected Response in Further Support of Consensus Proposal to Appoint Christopher M. Burke of Scott+Scott Attorneys At Law LLP and Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Table of Plaintiffs Supporting Each Leadership Proposal)(Zelcs, George)
August 2, 2018 Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file response nunc pro tunc is granted. No appearance on the motion is necessary. The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #57 #64 #65 #66 #68 #93 #94 #95 #96 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 108 STATEMENT to correct position of plaintiff Burnell as expressed by consensus proposal plaintiffs by Corey Burnell (Donahue, Darnell)
August 2, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth A. Fegan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #106 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/7/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION by Plaintiff Nathan L. Terwilliger Motion for Leave to File Response in Support of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP's Application for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel for NON-PSLRA Claims Nunc Pro Tunc (Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2018 Filing 105 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Nathan L. Terwilliger Response ISO Application for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP to Prosecute the Non-PSLRA Claims (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Berman, Steve)
August 1, 2018 Filing 104 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Atlantic Trading USA, LLC to status hearing,,, set deadlines,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, #46 In Support of Motion to Appoint Cohen Milstein and Cafferty Clobes to Rule 23(g) Leadership Structure (Fata, Anthony)
August 1, 2018 Filing 103 REPLY by Plaintiffs Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Brian Barry, Gary M. Beck, Breakwater Trading LLC, Tony Elich, Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Eric Levy Roth IRA, Robert Etten, Haldeman Realty Co., Inc., Susan Koza, Christopher Musso, John Pels, David Quint, David Samuel, Thomas J. Sanduski, William Siegel, Jeffery Tomasulo Response in Further Support of Consensus Proposal To Appoint Christopher M. Burke of Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Table of Plaintiffs Supporting Each Leadership Proposal)(Zelcs, George)
August 1, 2018 Filing 102 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Spencer Roland Bueno / Response of Quinn Emanuel and Robbins Geller in Support of Application for Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel, and Proposal for the Streamlined Prosecution of a Single Consolidated Complaint (Bunge, Jonathan)
August 1, 2018 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Further Support of Joint Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC as Interim Class Counsel STATEMENT by Amy Huang, Alex Palatiello (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Levitt, Adam)
August 1, 2018 Filing 100 REPLY Statement in Support of the Consensus Proposal by Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Eric Levy Roth IRA (Nussbaum, Linda) (Docket Text Modified on 8/2/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
August 1, 2018 Filing 99 RESPONSE by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. / CBOE's Response to Proposal for the Streamlined Prosecution of a Single Consolidated Complaint Contained in Application of Quinn Emanuel and Robbins Geller for Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel (Schar, Reid)
August 1, 2018 Filing 98 STATEMENT in response to Plaintiffs' proposals for Prosecution of this matter by IMC Financial Markets LLC, Belvedere Trading, LLC., CTC, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc, Consolidated Trading, LLC, DRW Holdings, LLC, Wolverine Trading L.P., Wolverine Trading LLC (Seeger, Kristen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 97 REPLY by Plaintiff FTC Capital GMBH to order #47 , memorandum #79 (Moriarty, Christopher)
August 1, 2018 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14766737. (Nix-Hines, Crystal)
July 31, 2018 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14759622. (Strikis, Silvija)
July 30, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14755449. (Zhang, Joanna)
July 27, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14750280. (Nam, Hae Sung)
July 26, 2018 Filing 92 Corrected STATEMENT by Gary M. Beck in Support of Scott+Scott and Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check Application for Co-Lead Counsel and Proposal for Leadership Structure (Brandt, Derek)
July 25, 2018 Filing 91 APPLICATION by David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) to Appoint Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP and Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP as Co-Lead Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Firm Profile)(Justice, Kimberly) (Docket Text Modified on 7/26/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 90 STATEMENT of Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. In Response To The Court's Order Of July 11, 2018 STATEMENT by Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Eric Levy Roth IRA (Nussbaum, Linda)
July 25, 2018 Filing 89 MOTION by Movant William Siegel to Appoint Hausfeld LLP to the Plaintiffs' Interim Leadership Structure (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer)(Scherrer, Hilary)
July 25, 2018 Filing 88 STATEMENT In Support of Application to Appoint Christopher M. Burke of Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP And Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP As Interim Co-Lead Counsel STATEMENT by David Quint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stull, Stull & Brody Resume)(Emert, Melissa)
July 25, 2018 Filing 87 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Susan Koza to Court's Order of July 11, 2018 in Support of the Application to (1) Appoint Scott + Scott and Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP Counsel; (2) Appoint Korein Tillery LLC as Liaison Counsel; and (3) Establish a Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freed, Michael) (Docket Text Modified on 7/26/2018 by Clerk's Office). (eaa, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 86 DECLARATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief,, #83 in Support of Application to Appoint Christopher M. Burke of Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lockridge Gindal Nauen P.L.L.P. Firm Profile and Attorney Bios)(Zelcs, George)
July 25, 2018 Filing 85 DECLARATION of George A. Zelcs regarding motion for miscellaneous relief,, #83 in Support of Application to Appoint Christopher M. Burke of Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Zelcs, George)
July 25, 2018 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Amanda F. Lawrence regarding motion for miscellaneous relief,, #83 in Support of Application to Appoint Christopher M. Burke of Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Zelcs, George)
July 25, 2018 Filing 83 APPLICATION by Plaintiffs Breakwater Trading LLC, John Pels, Jeffery Tomasulo to Appoint Christopher M. Burke of Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Scott+Scott Firm Profile, #2 Appendix B - Scott+Scott Attorney Bios, #3 Appendix C - Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C. Firm Profile and Attorney Bios, #4 Appendix D - Korein Tillery LLC Firm Profile and Attorney Bios)(Zelcs, George) (Docket Text Modified on 7/26/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 82 STATEMENT by Gary M. Beck in Support of Scott+Scott and Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check Application for Co-Lead Counsel and Proposal for Leadership Structure (Brandt, Derek)
July 25, 2018 Filing 81 APPLICATION for the Appointment of Michelle Looby of Gustafson Gluek PLLC and Mark Miller of Wexler Wallace LLP to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by Robert Etten (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Mark)
July 25, 2018 Filing 80 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Thomas J. Sanduski Berger & Montague, P.C.'s Statement in Response to the Court's Order of July 11, 2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
July 25, 2018 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM by FTC Capital GMBH in Response to Initial Status Order (Attachments: #1 Firm Resume)(Moriarty, Christopher)
July 25, 2018 Filing 78 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Projection Capital Markets, LLC by Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr (Kozlowski, Michael)
July 25, 2018 Filing 77 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Projection Capital Markets, LLC of Safirstein Metcalf and Esbrook Law, LLC for Membership in the Leadership Committee and In Support of the Appointment of Quinn Emanuel and Robbins Geller as Co-Lead Counsel (Esbrook, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified on 7/26/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 76 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Projection Capital Markets, LLC by Christopher J. Esbrook (Esbrook, Christopher)
July 25, 2018 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM by Brian Barry in Support of the Application to Appoint Kessler Topaz and Scott + Scott Interim Co-Lead Counsel, Appoint Korein Tillery Liaison Counsel, and Establish a Plaintiffs Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hollis, Salzman)
July 25, 2018 Filing 74 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Spencer Roland Bueno of Quinn Emanuel and Robbins Geller for Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel, and Proposal for the Streamlined Prosecution of a Single Consolidated Complaint (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Bunge, Jonathan) (Docket Text Modified on 7/26/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 73 JOINT Proposed by Amy Huang, Alex Palatiello Organizational Structure for Plaintiffs' Counsel's Interim Leadership and Joint Application, Pursuant to FRCP 23(g), to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC as Interim Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Levitt, Adam) (Docket Text Modified on 7/26/2018 by Clerk's Office). (eaa, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 72 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Nathan L. Terwilliger for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Class Counsel for Non-PSLRA Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1, #2 Exhibit - 2, #3 Exhibit - 3, #4 Exhibit - 4)(Berman, Steve) (Docket Text Modified on 7/26/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Gary L. Specks regarding memorandum, #70 Declaration of Gary L. Specks in Support of Plaintiff Christopher Mussos Application for Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLPs Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Counsel, or as a Member of an Executive Committee, for the Antitrust and Commodity Exchange Act Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Specks, Gary)
July 25, 2018 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM by Christopher Musso Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff Christopher Mussos Application for Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLPs Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Counsel, or as a Member of an Executive Committee, for the Antitrust and Commodity Exchange Act Claims (Specks, Gary)
July 25, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP to Court's Order of July 11, 2018 by Tony Elich (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Malmstrom, Carl)
July 25, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14742777. (Looby, Michelle)
July 25, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE by Ashley M. Kelly of Change of Address [Name Change] (Kelly, Ashley)
July 25, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14742457. (Robinson, Ashley)
July 25, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14741905. (Crevier, Jonathan)
July 25, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14741853. (Garvey, Karin)
July 25, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION by Plaintiff Atlantic Trading USA, LLCMotion to Appoint Cohen Milstein and Cafferty Clobes to the Rule 23(g) Leadership Structure (Fata, Anthony)
July 25, 2018 Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alex Palatiello by Amy Elisabeth Keller (Keller, Amy)
July 25, 2018 Filing 61 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tony Elich by Fred T Isquith (Isquith, Fred)
July 25, 2018 Filing 60 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tony Elich by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl)
July 23, 2018 Filing 59 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CTC, LLC by Josephine Park (Park, Josephine)
July 23, 2018 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CTC, LLC by Joseph Michael Bresnahan (Bresnahan, Joseph)
July 19, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14717585. (Bush, Graeme)
July 18, 2018 Filing 56 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2842. (jjr, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wolverine Trading L.P., Wolverine Trading LLC by Kristen R Seeger (Seeger, Kristen)
July 16, 2018 Filing 54 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wolverine Trading L.P., Wolverine Trading LLC by David Allan Geiger (Geiger, David)
July 16, 2018 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff FTC Capital GMBH by Christopher F. Moriarty (Moriarty, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DRW Holdings, LLC by Jonathan David Cogan (Cogan, Jonathan)
July 12, 2018 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffery Tomasulo by Michael E Klenov (Klenov, Michael)
July 12, 2018 Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc by Jonathan L Marcus (Marcus, Jonathan)
July 11, 2018 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Citigroup Financial Products, Inc, Citigroup Market Derivatives, Inc. by Karen Hoffman Lent (Hoffman Lent, Karen)
July 11, 2018 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/11/18 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 31427, 31429, 31431. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (Conway, Colleen)
July 11, 2018 Filing 47 INITIAL Status Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/11/2018. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 11, 2018 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiff Brunell does not oppose Plaintiff Bueno's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and counsel for PSLRA claims. Enter initial status order. Applications for appointment to lead plaintiff/counsel are due 7/25/18 and are limited to 15 pages, with joint submissions encouraged. Responses to applications are due 8/1/18 and are limited to 10 pages. A status hearing is tentatively scheduled for 8/8/18 at 11:00 a.m. for plaintiffs' counsel only. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 11, 2018 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 , #19 , #20 , #21 , #24 , #26 , #28 , #29 , #33 , and #34 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Musso by Gary L. Specks (Specks, Gary)
July 10, 2018 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc by R. Ryan Stoll (Stoll, R.)
July 10, 2018 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alex Palatiello by John E Tangren (Tangren, John)
July 9, 2018 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. in Response to the Court's June 26 Order #4 . (Schar, Reid) (Docket Text Modified on 7/10/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 9, 2018 Filing 40 STATEMENT by Plaintiff Spencer Roland Bueno in Response to the Court's June 26th Questions regarding Scheduling and Discovery Issues #4 (Bunge, Jonathan) (Docket Text Modified on 7/10/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 9, 2018 Filing 39 JOINT MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs Amy Huang, Alex Palatiello Concerning the Appointment of Plaintiffs' counsel, Scheduling, and Initiating Discovery to Identify Doe Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Levitt, Adam) (Docket Text Modified on 7/10/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 9, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Brian Barry, Tony Elich, Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated 1/21/10, Robert Etten, David Quint, David Samuel, Thomas J. Sanduski, William Siegel to text entry,, #4 Plaintiffs' Joint Statement In Response to June 26, 2018 Order (Justice, Kimberly)
July 9, 2018 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alex Palatiello by Adam M. Prom (Prom, Adam)
July 9, 2018 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alex Palatiello by Adam J. Levitt (Levitt, Adam)
July 9, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by Defendants Belvedere Trading, LLC., CTC, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc, Consolidated Trading, LLC, DRW Holdings, LLC, IMC Financial Markets LLC in Response to text entry,, #4 (Minute Order Of June 26, 2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Case Management Order))(Hoffman Lent, Karen) (Docket Text Modified on 7/10/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 9, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14676885. (Ratway, Hilary)
July 9, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14675546. (Cogan, Jonathan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Gary M. Beck, Haldeman Realty Co., Inc., Susan Koza, John Pels, Jeffery Tomasulo to text entry,, #10 , text entry,, #4 Submitting Plaintiffs' Joint Statement in Response to June 26 and June 29, 2018 Text Entries (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Charts Listing Actions by Product/Claim and Class Period)(Zelcs, George)
July 9, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Nathan L. Terwilliger to Court's June 26 Order (ECF No. 4) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berman, Steve) (Docket Text Modified on 7/10/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
July 9, 2018 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DRW Holdings, LLC by Michael Sangyun Kim (Kim, Michael)
July 9, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14675158. (Hoffman Lent, Karen)
July 9, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14674826. (Marcus, Jonathan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant IMC Financial Markets LLC by Ryan Patrick Phair (Phair, Ryan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14674103. (Weaver, Lesley)
July 9, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Atlantic Trading USA, LLC to text entry,, #10 IN RESPONSE TO JUNE 26, 2018 ORDER (Fata, Anthony)
July 9, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14673186. (Emert, Melissa)
July 8, 2018 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant IMC Financial Markets LLC by Julie B. Porter (Porter, Julie)
July 6, 2018 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas J. Sanduski by Michael C Dell'Angelo (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
July 6, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14669878. (Cramer, Eric)
July 6, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14669260. (Nussbaum, Linda)
July 6, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14668569. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Court Admissions)(Narwold, William)
July 5, 2018 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CTC, LLC by David Barry Goroff (Goroff, David)
July 5, 2018 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CTC, LLC by Thomas Paul Krebs (Krebs, Thomas)
July 5, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CTC, LLC by Stephen Patrick Bedell (Bedell, Stephen)
July 3, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 7/11/2018 at 10:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Harry P. Lamberson of Change of Address (Lamberson, Harry)
July 2, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Consolidated Trading, LLC by Harry P. Lamberson (Lamberson, Harry)
July 2, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Consolidated Trading, LLC by William Daniel Patterson (Patterson, William)
July 2, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Consolidated Trading, LLC by P. Stephen Fardy (Fardy, P.)
June 29, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The court's order requesting memoranda is clarified as follows. The request related to briefing plaintiff Bueno's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff/counsel was not intended to solicit substantive information about the merits or qualifications of any plaintiff or counsel for any particular role in the case. The court is interested in initial suggestions for a process by which plaintiffs and their counsel can be coordinated at this early stage of the MDL. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14645096. Kristen McCulloch (McCulloch, Kristen)
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nathan L. Terwilliger by Mark Thomas Vazquez (Vazquez, Mark)
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by John Shannon Marrese (Marrese, John)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by William Reiss (Reiss, William)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 7/9/18, parties may file memoranda no longer than five pages in length stating their position on the following: 1. briefing plaintiff Bueno's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and counsel; 2. setting deadlines for served defendants to respond to (one or more) complaints; and 3. initiating discovery to identify Doe defendants. Joint submissions are encouraged, and the parties may include other suggestions for early coordination of these cases. The memoranda must be filed on the master docket for the MDL, 18-cv-4171. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Manish S. Shah is presiding in MDL 2842 (18 CV 4171, In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation); and It further appearing that, 18 CV 1754, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC v. CBOE Global Markets, Inc. et al., and the related cases associated to 18 CV 1754 (listed below) are currently pending before the Hon. Manish S. Shah and the designate Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez, fall within the scope of MDL 2842; therefore It is hereby ordered that the Clerk is to reassign the cases listed below to MDL 2842 (18 CV 4171, In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation). Signed by Executive Committee on 6/26/2018. (td, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2842. (jjr, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 1 TRANSFER Order of 6/15/2018 from MDL Panel establishing MDL 2842. Case No.18cv04171 master docket. (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Financial Products Inc
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Jonathan L Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBOE Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Reid J Schar
Represented By: Gregory M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Board Options Exchange Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc.
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Jonathan L Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine Trading L.P.
Represented By: David Allan Geiger
Represented By: Kristen R Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Michael Bresnahan
Represented By: Thomas Paul Krebs
Represented By: Josephine Park
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Bedell
Represented By: David Barry Goroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Board of Options Exchange, Inc.
Represented By: Reid J Schar
Represented By: Gregory M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Market Derivatives, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Financial Products, Inc
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Jonathan L Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBOE Exchange, Inc.
Represented By: Reid J Schar
Represented By: Gregory M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRW Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan David Cogan
Represented By: Michael Sangyun Kim
Represented By: Clinton J. Dockery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine Trading LLC
Represented By: David Allan Geiger
Represented By: Kristen R Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC Financial Markets LLC
Represented By: Julie B. Porter
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Phair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Trading, LLC
Represented By: William Daniel Patterson
Represented By: Harry P. Lamberson
Represented By: P. Stephen Fardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Reid J Schar
Represented By: Gregory M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belvedere Trading, LLC.
Represented By: Christian T. Kemnitz
Represented By: Hannah Olivia Koesterer
Represented By: Charles Allan Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Securities
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Abby Marie Mollen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Levy Roth IRA
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LRI Invest S.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTC Capital GMBH
Represented By: Christopher F. Moriarty
Represented By: Erin Durba
Represented By: Michelle C. Clerkin
Represented By: Michael M Buchman
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haldeman Realty Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jerry Freed
Represented By: Anna Marie Horning Nygren
Represented By: William Henry London
Represented By: Heidi M. Silton
Represented By: Brian David Clark
Represented By: Robert J. Wozniak
Represented By: Brian M. Hogan
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tad Berger
Represented By: D''Ancona E. Joshua
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Elich
Represented By: Fred T Isquith
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan L. Terwilliger
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Kristen McCulloch
Represented By: Mark Thomas Vazquez
Represented By: Michael W. Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Samuel
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: Stacey M. Kaplan
Represented By: Alejandro Caffarelli
Represented By: D''Ancona E. Joshua
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Represented By: Alexis D Martin
Represented By: Joshua A. Materese
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Roland Bueno
Represented By: Frank Anthony Richter
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel L. Brockett
Represented By: Steven M. Jodlowski
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Brian O O'Mara
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: David LeRay
Represented By: Jeremy D. Andersen
Represented By: Crystal Nix-Hines
Represented By: Christopher M. Seck
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: Ashley M. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel R. Lombard
Represented By: James E Barz
Represented By: Toby Edward Futter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Huang
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Crevier
Represented By: Christopher J McDonald
Represented By: Zachary Jayson Ziliak
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Matthew J Perez
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: Brian Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Sanduski
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Michael C Dell'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Burnell
Represented By: Michael J. Nicoud
Represented By: Charles F Morrissey
Represented By: Darnell Donahue
Represented By: George Carlos Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Musso
Represented By: Jeffrey Philip Campisi
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Klafter
Represented By: Gary L. Specks
Represented By: Hae Sung Nam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Etten
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Michelle J. Looby
Represented By: Sharon S Almonrode
Represented By: Dennis Allen Lienhardt, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Choa
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: Manuel Juan Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Siegel
Represented By: Lesley E. Weaver
Represented By: Hilary K. Scherrer
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Jeanette Bayoumi
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Trading Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pels
Represented By: Daniel V. Dorris
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Joanna Tianyang Zhang
Represented By: Silvija Anna Strikis
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: David K. Suska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Koza
Represented By: Michael Jerry Freed
Represented By: William Henry London
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Brian M. Hogan
Represented By: Michael Elliot Criden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Cary
Represented By: Stacey M. Kaplan
Represented By: D''Ancona E. Joshua
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Barry
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Represented By: Hollis L. Salzman
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: John Shannon Marrese
Represented By: William Reiss
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Represented By: Eamon O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Palatiello
Represented By: Adam M. Prom
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: John E Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary M. Beck
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breakwater Trading LLC
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Chad Emerson Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Projection Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
Represented By: Christopher J. Esbrook
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Tomasulo
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Kristen M. Anderson
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Amanda F Lawrence
Represented By: Aaron M Zigler
Represented By: Graeme W. Bush
Represented By: Chad Emerson Bell
Represented By: Matthew Charles Davies
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Quint
Represented By: Melissa Robin Emert
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Represented By: Aaron L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Trading USA, LLC
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Represented By: Carol V Gilden
Represented By: Times Wang
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Michael Eisenkraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S. Aaron
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LJM Partners, Ltd.
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?