Northwest Pallet Services, LLC v. Holley
Plaintiff: Northwest Pallet Services, LLC
Defendant: Jonathon Holley
Case Number: 1:2018cv04801
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by Northwest Pallet Services, LLC against Jonathon Holley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Showel, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northwest Pallet Services, LLC as to Jonathon Holley on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Showel, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The complaint in this case, which was filed in federal court based on alleged diversity of citizenship, alleges the state of residence of the defendant but not his state of citizenship. The two are not necessarily the same. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint curing this defect by no later than 9/7/2018. (mk)
August 19, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 9/12/2018 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
August 15, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Jonathon Holley. (tg, )
July 20, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Jonathon Holley. (acm)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northwest Pallet Services, LLC by Matthew Showel (Showel, Matthew)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Northwest Pallet Services, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14697125. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Showel, Matthew)
July 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (dal, )
July 13, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jonathon Holley (yt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Pallet Services, LLC v. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Pallet Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?