Sanchez-Bates et al v. Shibui South Condominium Association

Plaintiff: Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates and South Suburban Housing Center
Defendant: Shibui South Condominium Association
Case Number: 1:2018cv04827
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of submission of paper or other materials to the clerk by Angelica Sanchez-Bates, Terrance Bates, South Suburban Housing Center. (Attachments: #1 Flash Drive (Document not imaged)). (tt, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion to continue the initial status hearing #8 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/14/2018 is stricken and reset to 10/1/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 20 JURY Demand (Kendzior, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shibui South Condominium Association by James Paul Kendzior and John M. Coleman (Kendzior, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shibui South Condominium Association by James Paul Kendzior (Kendzior, James)
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Lynn Taren for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/2/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center in support of motion for preliminary injunction #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dec of Angelica Sanchez-Bates, #2 Exhibit 2 - Shibui CCRs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Case)(Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center for preliminary injunction Corrected Motion (Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Lynn Taren for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction, #13 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/2/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center for preliminary injunction Against Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dec of Angelica Sanchez-Bates, #2 Exhibit 2 - Shibui CCRs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Case)(Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center to expedite Discovery (Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Lynn Taren for presentment of Mtn by Plaintiffs for Expedited Discovery before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/2/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Taren, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/27/2018 (nsf, ).
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing CenterConsolidate Hearing on Preliminary Injunction with Trial on the Merits (Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Lynn Taren for presentment of Pls' Motion to Consolidate Hearing on Preliminary Injunction with Trial on the Merits before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/2/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Taren, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/27/2018 (nsf, ).
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center to continue Initial Status Conference (Taren, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Lynn Taren for presentment of before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Taren, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center regarding Summons and Complaint Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery, Standing Order re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project served on Kenneth Donkel, Registered Agent on 8/01/2018 (Taren, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. Status hearing set for 9/14/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center by Miriam N. Geraghty (Geraghty, Miriam)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
July 16, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Shibui South Condominium Association (jjr, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terrance Bates, Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center by Jeffrey Lynn Taren (Taren, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (jjr, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Temporary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by Angelica Sanchez-Bates, South Suburban Housing Center, Terrance Bates; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14700041. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taren, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Bates et al v. Shibui South Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Bates
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Miriam N. Geraghty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Sanchez-Bates
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Miriam N. Geraghty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Suburban Housing Center
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Miriam N. Geraghty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shibui South Condominium Association
Represented By: John Martin Coleman
Represented By: James Paul Kendzior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?