U.S. Bank National Association v. Bender
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Diamond Bender
Case Number: 1:2018cv04905
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association by Adam A Price (Price, Adam)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Case called on 9/13/18. No one appeared. Status hearing set for 9/18/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY by U.S. Bank National Association to Response #13 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kemock, Michael)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Defendant Diamond Bender to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (lf, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Response to Plaintiff's motion to remand #10 due by 8/21/2018, reply due by 9/4/2018. No appearance necessary on 8/21/2018. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Ryan Kemock for presentment of motion to remand, #10 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/21/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kemock, Michael)
July 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Certificate of Service)(Kemock, Michael)
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association by Michael Ryan Kemock (Kemock, Michael)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 9/13/18 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diamond Bender (cc, )
July 19, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association (pj, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Diamond Bender (sxb, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from the Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (17 CH 008511) filed by Diamond Bender. Filing fee $400. (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael Ryan Kemock
Represented By: Adam A Price
Represented By: Ernest John Codilis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?