Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust v. Kraft et al

Plaintiff: Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust
Defendant: RWK Global Holdings LLC, MTI Connect LLC, RCI FirstPathway Citizenship Investment Fund LLC, World Marketing Management Company Inc, Blue Streak Holdings Inc, Robert W Kraft, World Marketing Holdings LLC and Lisa Sengregret
Case Number: 1:2018cv04909
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 10/2/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 23, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lisa Sengregret by Erich Siegfried Buck (Buck, Erich)
July 20, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blue Streak Holdings Inc, Robert W Kraft, MTI Connect LLC, RCI FirstPathway Citizenship Investment Fund LLC, RWK Global Holdings LLC, World Marketing Holdings LLC, World Marketing Management Company Inc by Shelly A DeRousse (DeRousse, Shelly). (Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office) Modified on 7/20/2018 (mc, ).
July 20, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust by Sharon Doherty Sirott (Sirott, Sharon)
July 20, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust by Mark Stanley Melickian (Melickian, Mark)
July 20, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust by Michael Aaron Brandess (Brandess, Michael)
July 20, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust by Elizabeth Buckey Vandesteeg (Vandesteeg, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2018 3 MAILED Rule 83.16 letter with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (jk, )
July 19, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blue Streak Holdings Inc, Robert W Kraft, MTI Connect LLC, RCI FirstPathway Citizenship Investment Fund LLC, RWK Global Holdings LLC, World Marketing Holdings LLC, World Marketing Management Company Inc by Elizabeth L. Janczak (Janczak, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (yt)
July 18, 2018 1 MOTION to withdraw reference (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust v. Kraft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWK Global Holdings LLC
Represented By: Shelly A DeRousse
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTI Connect LLC
Represented By: Shelly A DeRousse
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI FirstPathway Citizenship Investment Fund LLC
Represented By: Shelly A DeRousse
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Marketing Management Company Inc
Represented By: Shelly A DeRousse
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Streak Holdings Inc
Represented By: Shelly A DeRousse
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Kraft
Represented By: Shelly A DeRousse
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Marketing Holdings LLC
Represented By: Shelly A DeRousse
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Janczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Sengregret
Represented By: Erich Siegfried Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman B Newman, solely as Liquidating Trustee of the World Marketing Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Mark Stanley Melickian
Represented By: Elizabeth Buckey Vandesteeg
Represented By: Michael Aaron Brandess
Represented By: Aaron Leonard Hammer
Represented By: Sharon Doherty Sirott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?