Ordaz v. Little Company of Mary Hospital & Healthcare Centers
Plaintiff: Patricia Ordaz
Defendant: Little Company of Mary Hospital & Healthcare Centers and Little Company of Mary Hospital & Healthcare Ctrs.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05188
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:MIDP disclosures shall be served by 10/31/2018. Status hearing set for 10/4/2018 #7 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 11/7/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patricia Ordaz. Little Company of Mary Hospital & Healthcare Ctrs. waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Monahan, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The docket does not reflect that summons has been issued, let alone served. Status hearing set for 9/4/2018 #5 is stricken and re-set for 10/4/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Ordaz by Matthew John Monahan (Monahan, Matthew)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/4/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (eaa, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Ordaz by Lisa J. Palumbo (Palumbo, Lisa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Palumbo, Lisa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Ordaz; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14758334.(Palumbo, Lisa)
July 30, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (acm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ordaz v. Little Company of Mary Hospital & Healthcare Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ordaz
Represented By: Lisa J. Palumbo
Represented By: Matthew John Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Company of Mary Hospital & Healthcare Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Company of Mary Hospital & Healthcare Ctrs.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?