Rodriguez v. Soo Line Railroad Co

Plaintiff: Jose M Rodriguez
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Co
Case Number: 1:2018cv05231
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
0 Judge: Jorge L Alonso
1 Judge: Young B Kim
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties are ordered to adhere to the following written discovery schedule: (1) serve written discovery requests by October 22, 2018; (2) serve answers to written discovery requests by November 30, 2018; and (3) confer about the adequacy of the discovery responses by December 7, 2018. If requests for production of documents are served, the responding party must produce or give access to the responsive documents by November 30, 2018, along with a privilege log if responsive documents are withheld. Also, the court will not consider general objections to written discovery requests if the court must address and rule on written discovery disputes. Parties are to file a joint status report identifying each side's written discovery issues, if any, along with the relevant written discovery responses as exhibits by December 14, 2018. If the parties do not have any disputed written discovery issues, a status report is not required. A status hearing is scheduled for December 19, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019 to discuss the written discovery issues identified and anticipated oral discovery. Mailed notice (ma,)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference. (ntf, ) Notice mailed by judge's staff
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 8/8/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' MIDP disclosures shall be served by 10/13/18. All fact discovery shall be noticed in time to be completed by 7/31/19. Parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss settlement. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for discovery supervision, with authority to extend deadlines, and a settlement conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Soo Line Railroad Co (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zaharski, Kristen)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Soo Line Railroad Co by Kristen Jean Zaharski (Zaharski, Kristen)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Soo Line Railroad Co by Maureen Ann McGuire (McGuire, Maureen)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 9/18/18 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
August 1, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (kb, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose M Rodriguez by James T. Foley (Foley, James)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Foley, James)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jose M Rodriguez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14765478.(Foley, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Soo Line Railroad Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M Rodriguez
Represented By: James T. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Co
Represented By: Maureen Ann McGuire
Represented By: Kristen Jean Zaharski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?