Lundquist v. Stone Gate Condominium Association I et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Lundquist
Defendant: Stone Gate Condominium Association I and ABC Property Managers Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv05239
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ABC Property Managers Inc, Stone Gate Condominium Association I (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lulich, Lawrence)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case is set for an initial status conference on 10/11/18 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 10/4/2018. Mailed notice (air, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Lundquist as to Stone Gate Condominium Association I on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Rosenberg, Mary)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Lundquist as to ABC Property Managers Inc on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Rosenberg, Mary)
September 5, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Stone Gate Condominium Association I. (acm)
September 5, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ABC Property Managers Inc. (acm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, )
August 1, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (kb, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nancy Lundquist by Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Mary)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rosenberg, Mary)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nancy Lundquist; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14766437. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits)(Rosenberg, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundquist v. Stone Gate Condominium Association I et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Gate Condominium Association I
Represented By: Lawrence Mark Lulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Property Managers Inc
Represented By: Lawrence Mark Lulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lundquist
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?