Nandorf, Inc. et al v. Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc. and Southwest Management Company
Defendant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05285
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 9/20/2018. Defendant's motion to compel arbitration #16 is briefed as follows: response shall be filed on or before 10/18/2018; reply shall be filed on or before 11/8/2018; motion hearing set for 12/5/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. MIDP discovery deadlines will be set upon motion, if necessary. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) (Joint Initial Status Report), filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company. (Douglass, Richard)
September 10, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion to compel arbitration #16 is entered and continued to 9/20/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The 9/13/18 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Anton Roselius for presentment of motion to compel #16 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/13/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Roselius, Joseph)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. in support of motion to compel #16 arbitration (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Group 6)(Roselius, Joseph)
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. to compel Arbitration (Roselius, Joseph)
August 13, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant AUCRA's motion for extension of time to file its answer #11 is granted, and AUCRA shall file its answer or other responsive pleading by 9/6/18. The 8/16/18 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 9/20/18 initial status conference and 9/10/18 initial status report deadline stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company (Douglass, Richard)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal, #1 - Agreed Motion To Set Date To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint #11 , notice of removal, #1 (Roselius, Joseph)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Anton Roselius for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #11 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/16/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Roselius, Joseph)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal, #1 - Agreed Motion To Set Date To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint (Roselius, Joseph)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company by Carl Michael Johnson (Johnson, Carl)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company by Richard George Douglass (Douglass, Richard)
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDPs intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 9/20/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 9/10/2018, using the model template set forth in this Courts standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Shand S. Stephens' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jk, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14773744. (Stephens, Shand)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. by Joseph Michael Carey (Carey, Joseph)
August 2, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (rc, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. by Joseph Anton Roselius (Roselius, Joseph)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roselius, Joseph)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018 CH 8417) filed by Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14772584. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Roselius, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nandorf, Inc. et al v. Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alterman
Represented By: Richard George Douglass
Represented By: Carl Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nandorf, Inc.
Represented By: Richard George Douglass
Represented By: Carl Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Management Company
Represented By: Richard George Douglass
Represented By: Carl Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Shand S. Stephens
Represented By: Joseph Anton Roselius
Represented By: Joseph Michael Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?