Parham v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marion Howard Parham
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc of Illinois, Stateville Correctional Center, Medical Director, The and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05316
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc. by Victor Franklin Price (Price, Victor)
September 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 10/9/2018 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marion Howard Parham by Jesse R. Tyler (Tyler, Jesse)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc.,'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.(Tengesdal, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc. by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles P. Kocoras no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/22/18. (smm)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Stateville Correctional Center, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. (jn, )
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marion Howard Parham by Timothy R. Tyler (Tyler, Timothy)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tyler, Timothy)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT 18-cv-05316 filed by Marion Howard Parham; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14778386.(Tyler, Timothy)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parham v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Victor Franklin Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Howard Parham
Represented By: Timothy R. Tyler
Represented By: Jesse R. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?