Weber v. Gustafsson et al

Plaintiff: Theodore Weber
Defendant: Janice Roberts, Zebra Technologies Corporation, Michael A. Smith, Richard L. Keyser, Andrew K. Ludwick, Frank Modruson, Anders Gustafsson, Ross W. Manire, Chirantan Desai and Michael C. Smiley
Case Number: 1:2018cv05325
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14970864. (Gambino-Morrison, Shaelyn)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION And Proposed Order To Stay Lawsuit (Carlson, Walter)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion to reassign case 18-cv-5721, Zucker v. Gustafsson to this Court's calendar #9 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/25/18 is re-set to 10/4/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Walter C. Carlson for presentment of motion to reassign case, #9 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Carlson, Walter)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Chirantan Desai, Anders Gustafsson, Richard L. Keyser, Andrew K. Ludwick, Ross W. Manire, Frank Modruson, Janice Roberts, Michael C. Smiley, Michael A. Smith, Zebra Technologies Corporation in support of motion to reassign case, #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carlson, Walter)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Chirantan Desai, Anders Gustafsson, Richard L. Keyser, Andrew K. Ludwick, Ross W. Manire, Frank Modruson, Janice Roberts, Michael C. Smiley, Michael A. Smith, Zebra Technologies Corporation to reassign case (Carlson, Walter)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chirantan Desai, Anders Gustafsson, Richard L. Keyser, Andrew K. Ludwick, Ross W. Manire, Frank Modruson, Janice Roberts, Michael C. Smiley, Michael A. Smith, Zebra Technologies Corporation by Zarine L Alam (Alam, Zarine)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chirantan Desai, Anders Gustafsson, Richard L. Keyser, Andrew K. Ludwick, Ross W. Manire, Frank Modruson, Janice Roberts, Michael C. Smiley, Michael A. Smith, Zebra Technologies Corporation by James Wallace Ducayet (Ducayet, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chirantan Desai, Anders Gustafsson, Richard L. Keyser, Andrew K. Ludwick, Ross W. Manire, Frank Modruson, Janice Roberts, Michael C. Smiley, Michael A. Smith, Zebra Technologies Corporation by Walter C. Carlson (Carlson, Walter)
August 9, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chirantan Desai, Anders Gustafsson, Richard L. Keyser, Andrew K. Ludwick, Ross W. Manire, Frank Modruson, Janice Roberts, Michael C. Smiley, Michael A. Smith, Zebra Technologies Corporation (pj, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theodore Weber by John D. Scheflow (Scheflow, John)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theodore Weber by Anthony F. Fata (Fata, Anthony)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 9/25/18 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice(maf)
August 3, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (jjr, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fata, Anthony)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Theodore Weber; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14779380.(Fata, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber v. Gustafsson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Roberts
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zebra Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Smith
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Keyser
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew K. Ludwick
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Modruson
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anders Gustafsson
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross W. Manire
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chirantan Desai
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Smiley
Represented By: Zarine L Alam
Represented By: Walter C. Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Weber
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Shaelyn Gambino-Morrison
Represented By: John D. Scheflow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?