Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. v. Cambium Networks, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.
Defendant: Dmitry Moiseev, Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Winncom Technologies, Inc. and Cambium Networks, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05369
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. #70 (Ives, Erik)
August 2, 2019 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE of Service CORRECTED by Hopkins Guy on behalf of Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. regarding memorandum in opposition to motion, #75 (Guy, Hopkins)
July 31, 2019 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM by Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief #72 (Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guy, Hopkins)
July 16, 2019 Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 9/4/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion to dismiss #70 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond by 8/13/2019; Defendant shall reply by 8/27/2019. Plaintiff's motion to lift stay of discovery #72 is entered and continued. Defendant shall respond to that motion by 7/31/2019. The 7/18/2019 motion hearing #73 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Motion by Jason J Keener for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #72 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Keener, Jason)
July 15, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION by Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.Lift Stay of Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keener, Jason)
July 10, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Hopkins Guy for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #70 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/16/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Guy, Hopkins)
July 10, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Declaration of Andrew Wilson, #12 Declaration Jeff Fischer)(Guy, Hopkins)
June 26, 2019 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file excess pages #67 is granted. The parties may file principal briefs of up to 30 pages in conjunection with the forthcoming motion to dismiss. Motion hearing set for 7/1/2019 #68 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Motion by Hopkins Guy for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #67 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Guy, Hopkins)
June 25, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION by Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. for leave to file excess pages JOINT MOTION (Guy, Hopkins)
June 19, 2019 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/16/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before 7/10/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 65 First AMENDED complaint by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Keener, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney #60 is granted. Attorney Zachary Lazar is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion for extension of time #61 is granted. The time for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint is extended to 6/18/2019. Motion hearing set for 5/30/2019 #62 is stricken. The status hearing set for 6/11/2019 #54 is stricken and re-set for 6/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM by Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. in Opposition to motion for extension of time to amend #61 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Guy, Hopkins)
May 24, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Erik J. Ives for presentment of motion for extension of time to amend #61 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ives, Erik)
May 24, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION by Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. for extension of time to amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ives, Erik)
May 24, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION by Attorney Zachary R. Lazar to withdraw as attorney for Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. No party information provided (Lazar, Zachary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/22/2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendants' motion to dismiss #37 is denied in part (as to Rule 12(b)(1)) and granted in part (as to Rule 12(b)(6)). The complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has until 6/5/2019 to file an amended complaint. If it does not do so, the dismissal will convert automatically to a dismissal with prejudice. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Defendants will have until 6/19/2019 to file their response. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Unopposed motion to substitute attorney #55 is granted. Attorneys Elizabeth Brooke Herrington, Mark Louis Krotoski, Robert C. Bertin and Amy Michele Dudash are terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Substitute counsel may file their appearances. Motion hearing set for 5/6/2019 #56 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 56 Notice of unopposed motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel - NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #55 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
April 30, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION by Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. to substitute attorney - Unopposed motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel for Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2019 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 5/1/2019 #50 is stricken and re-set for 6/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. A ruling on the pending motion to dismiss #37 will issue shortly.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. by David E. Koropp (Koropp, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. by Jason J Keener (Keener, Jason)
April 10, 2019 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. by Erik J. Ives (Ives, Erik)
March 22, 2019 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: At the parties' request, the status hearing set for 04/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #49 is stricken and re-set for 5/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 2/28/2019 #48 is stricken and re-set for 4/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 1/28/2019 #43 is stricken and re-set for 2/28/2019 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Defendants' opposed motion to extend the deadline to produce ESI pursuant to the MIDP standing order and memorandum in support thereof #44 is granted. Because the court is likely to grant in substantial part the motion to dismiss #37 , the deadline for producing MIDP ESI is continued generally and will be re-set at the appropriate juncture. The motion hearing set for 12/20/2018 #45 is stricken. Mailed notice. (dal, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. by Christopher R. Parker (Parker, Christopher)
December 17, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by George Hopkins Guy for presentment of extension of time, #44 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/20/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Guy, George)
December 17, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION by Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. for extension of time Defendants' Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Produce ESI Pursuant to the MIDP Standing Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karina A. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1-3)(Guy, George)
December 11, 2018 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/28/2019 at 9:15 a.m. The parties report on the status of discovery. Oral argument held on pending motion to dismiss #37 . The motion is taken under advisement and the Court will issue ruling by mail.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 5, 2018 Filing 41 Notice by Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Service and Compliance (Guy, George)
December 5, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY by Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion #39 Defendants' Reply in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew D. Wilson in support of Defendants' Reply, #2 Exhibit 11-12)(Guy, George)
November 16, 2018 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss #37 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Case No. 1, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Case No. 2)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2018 Filing 38 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc.(Fieweger, James)
October 19, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendants Cambium Networks, Inc., Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. to dismiss (Fieweger, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/11/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Defendants, who have filed a memorandum in support of dismissal #33 but not a formal motion to dismiss, shall file a formal motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's response due by 11/16/2018; reply due by 12/5/2018. The time to serve MIDP disclosures is extended to 12/5/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. by Zachary Ryan Lazar (Lazar, Zachary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE by Cambium Networks, Inc.(Fieweger, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Fieweger, James)
October 12, 2018 Filing 32 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Herrington, Elizabeth)
September 27, 2018 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file excess pages #27 is granted. he parties may file oversized principal briefs in connection with the forthcoming motion to dismiss of no greater than 30 pages. Motion hearing set for 10/2/2018 #28 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #29 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14995547. (Bertin, Robert)
September 26, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by James Peter Fieweger for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #27 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/2/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Fieweger, James)
September 26, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant Cambium Networks, Inc. for leave to file excess pages JOINT MOTION (Fieweger, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to appear pro hac vice #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 and #24 are granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 25 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. (Krotoski, Mark)
September 14, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14946983. Jon V. Swenson (Fieweger, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14946963. Karina Smith (Fieweger, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14946930. G. Hopkins Guy, III (Fieweger, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14946884. Andrew D. Wilson (Fieweger, James)
September 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14937479. (Dudash, Amy)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #17 is granted. The time for Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to 10/15/2018. Motion hearing set for 9/5/2018 #18 is stricken. The time to serve MIDP disclosures is extended to 11/15/2018. Status hearing set for 10/30/2018 #14 is stricken and re-set for 10/18/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by James Peter Fieweger for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #17 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Fieweger, James)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Cambium Networks, Inc. for extension of time to file answer to Complaint (Fieweger, James)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. by James Peter Fieweger (Fieweger, James)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. by Arthur Gollwitzer, III (Gollwitzer, Arthur)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:MIDP disclosures shall be served by 10/9/2018. Status hearing set for 9/11/2018 #7 is stricken and re-set for 10/30/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 10/23/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. as to Dmitry Moiseev on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. as to Sakid Ahmed on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. as to Winncom Technologies, Inc. on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. as to Blip Networks, LLC on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. as to Cambium Networks, Ltd. on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter to Cambium Networks, Ltd., #2 Exhibit Attachment 1 to letter, #3 Exhibit Attachment 2 to letter, #4 Exhibit Attachment 3 to letter, #5 Exhibit Attachment 4 to letter, #6 Exhibit Attachment 5 to letter, #7 Exhibit Attachment 6 to letter, #8 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. as to Cambium Networks, Inc. on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/11/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 10, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Sakid Ahmed, Blip Networks, LLC, Cambium Networks, Inc., Cambium Networks, Ltd., Dmitry Moiseev, Winncom Technologies, Inc. (jjr, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (#1 Attachment). (yap, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (rc, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14791581. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Herrington, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. v. Cambium Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dmitry Moiseev
Represented By: Andrew David Wilson
Represented By: Karina Smith
Represented By: Hopkins Guy
Represented By: Jon V Swenson
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Represented By: Christopher R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sakid Ahmed
Represented By: Andrew David Wilson
Represented By: Karina Smith
Represented By: Hopkins Guy
Represented By: Jon V Swenson
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Represented By: Christopher R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blip Networks, LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Wilson
Represented By: Karina Smith
Represented By: Hopkins Guy
Represented By: Jon V Swenson
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Represented By: Christopher R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambium Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Wilson
Represented By: Karina Smith
Represented By: Hopkins Guy
Represented By: Jon V Swenson
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Represented By: Christopher R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winncom Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Wilson
Represented By: Karina Smith
Represented By: Hopkins Guy
Represented By: Jon V Swenson
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Represented By: Christopher R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambium Networks, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew David Wilson
Represented By: Karina Smith
Represented By: Hopkins Guy
Represented By: Jon V Swenson
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Represented By: Christopher R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Represented By: Robert C. Bertin
Represented By: Amy Michele Dudash
Represented By: Mark Louis Krotoski
Represented By: Jason J Keener
Represented By: Zachary Ryan Lazar
Represented By: Erik J. Ives
Represented By: David E. Koropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?