Abrasic 90 Inc.v. Weldcote Metals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA and Abrasic 90 Inc.
Defendant: Joseph O'Mera, Colleen Cervencik and Weldcote Metals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05376
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 43 Response to Defendant's Second Combined Discovery Requests by Abrasic 90 Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Rosenson, Arthur)
October 2, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc. regarding amended complaint,, #41 (Rosenson, Arthur)
October 2, 2018 Filing 41 Plaintiff's First AMENDED complaint by Abrasic 90 Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Amended Complaint)(Rosenson, Arthur)
September 27, 2018 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on September 26, 2018 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 32320. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2018. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
September 26, 2018 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint and amended motion for preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by 10/2/18. Any motion Defendant files in response is to be filed by 12:00 p.m. on 10/8/18. Status hearing continued to 10/9/18 at 10:00 a.m. Evidentiary hearing set on 10/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Colleen Cervencik, Joseph O'Mera, Weldcote Metals, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc. to amend/correct notice of motion #5 , complaint,, #1 to Amend Count V and Counts IX-X and Amend Motion for Preliminary Injuunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morrison, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc. regarding other #36 Plaintiff's Memorandum (Rosenson, Arthur)
September 21, 2018 Filing 36 Plaintiff's Memorandum re: Trade Secret Amalgamation by Abrasic 90 Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum)(Rosenson, Arthur)
September 17, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the parties' agreed request, the presentment of plaintiff's motion for leave to file #33 is reset for 10:00 a.m. on 9/26/18 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Arthur Edward Rosenson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, #33 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/26/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Rosenson, Arthur)
September 14, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc. to amend/correct notice of motion #5 , complaint,, #1 to Amend Count V and Counts IX-X and Amend Motion for Preliminary Injuunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Motion)(Rosenson, Arthur)
September 14, 2018 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 15, 2018 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 32152. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2018. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
September 13, 2018 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 8, 2018 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 32118. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2018. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
September 12, 2018 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the parties' agreed telephonic request, the status hearing is set for 9/26/18 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 31, 2018 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 32035. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2018. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
August 31, 2018 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Hearing held. Defendant Weldcote is to produce the mirrored computer drives to Plaintiff's forensic expert as directed in open court. Plaintiff's expert and counsel to review file directories for relevant items and designate for production. Parties to confer re any objections by Defendant. Guiding principle determining scope of data review will be identification of information obtained directly from Plaintiff, or derived from such information. Parties may also proceed to issue other discovery requests necessary for preliminary injunction. Response time for discovery requests is set for 14 days. Such requests must be appropriately limited to the accelerated and nondispositive nature of a preliminary injunction hearing. A date for the preliminary injunction hearing will be set at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (air, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 27 EXHIBIT by Defendants Colleen Cervencik, Joseph O'Mera, Weldcote Metals, Inc. CORRECTED EXHIBIT A - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH O'MERA TO ECF #26 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM RE: AUGUST 31, 2018 HEARING regarding Response #26 (Morrison, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Defendants Colleen Cervencik, Joseph O'Mera, Weldcote Metals, Inc. to memorandum #22 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morrison, David)
August 29, 2018 Filing 25 AGREED Confidentiality Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/29/2018. Mailed notice(air, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motion for entry of the agreed protective order #19 is granted. No appearance is required on this motion. Enter order. Mailed notice (air, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Abrasic 90 Inc. Re August 31, 2018 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 9-12)(Rosenson, Arthur)
August 28, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service by Arthur Edward Rosenson on behalf of Abrasic 90 Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc. for order Agreed Protective Order #19 , notice of motion #20 (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 28, 2018 Filing 20 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Arthur Edward Rosenson for presentment of before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/4/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 28, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc. for order Agreed Protective Order (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 23, 2018 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 21, 2018 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 31893. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2018. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
August 20, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Defendants Colleen Cervencik, Joseph O'Mera, Weldcote Metals, Inc. to Plaintiff's Oral Motion for Forensic Examination (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morrison, David)
August 15, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued by agreement of the parties to 8/21/18 at 11:00 a.m. By agreement, the Court's Order #12 shall remain in effect pending a hearing on the Plaintiff's preliminary injunction motion. Parties are to confer as to the scope of discovery, before the preliminary injunction hearing and to advise the Court regarding their agreement(s) and/or disputes at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (air, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Colleen Cervencik, Joseph O'Mera, Weldcote Metals, Inc. by Meredith S. Kirshenbaum (Kirshenbaum, Meredith)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Colleen Cervencik, Joseph O'Mera, Weldcote Metals, Inc. by David E. Morrison (Morrison, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:A status hearing is set for 8/15/2018 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice (air, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/8/2018:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-7)(air, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Emergency motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restaining order is granted in part. Enter Order. Mailed notice (air, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Arthur Edward Rosenson on behalf of Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA regarding affidavit in support of motion,, #8 , memorandum in support of motion,, #6 , affidavit in support of motion, #7 (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA in Support of MOTION by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Affidavit)(Rosenson, Arthur)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA in Support of MOTION by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction #4 (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA in support of motion for temporary restraining order #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Memorandum, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Memorandum, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Memorandum, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Memorandum, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Memorandum)(Rosenson, Arthur)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency NOTICE of Motion by Arthur Edward Rosenson for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #4 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/8/2018 at 03:30 PM. (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 8, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (pj, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA by Arthur Edward Rosenson (Rosenson, Arthur)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Other Relief filed by Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14792444. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenson, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrasic 90 Inc.v. Weldcote Metals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abrasic 90 Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a CGW Camel Grinding Wheels, USA
Represented By: Arthur Edward Rosenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abrasic 90 Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Edward Rosenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph O'Mera
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Represented By: Meredith S. Kirshenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Cervencik
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Represented By: Meredith S. Kirshenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weldcote Metals, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Represented By: Meredith S. Kirshenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?