F2VS Technologies, LLC v. B+B Smartworx Inc.

Plaintiff: F2VS Technologies, LLC
Defendant: B+B Smartworx Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05406
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
0 Judge: Charles P Kocoras
1 Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Status hearing held on 9/28/2018. Defendant is given 14 additional days to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint. Status hearing on settlement is continued to 10/19/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 27, 2018 19 STIPULATION To Extend Response Deadline And Continue Status Hearing (Haller, Timothy)
September 27, 2018 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's time to answer or otherwise is extended to and including September 28, 2018 #16 . Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 26, 2018 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14990827. (McDonough, James)
September 21, 2018 16 STIPULATION - Stipulation To Extend Response Deadline (Haller, Timothy)
August 30, 2018 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to Extend Response Deadline #12 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, August 31, 2018. Status hearing on settlement is set for 9/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 29, 2018 14 NOTICE of Motion by Garet K. Galster for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/31/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Galster, Garet)
August 28, 2018 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BB Smartworx Inc. (Galster, Garet)
August 28, 2018 12 MOTION by Defendant BB Smartworx Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, #1 unopposed by Plaintiff (Galster, Garet)
August 28, 2018 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BB Smartworx Inc. by Garet K. Galster (Galster, Garet)
August 28, 2018 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BB Smartworx Inc. by Stephen David Scallan (Scallan, Stephen)
August 28, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BB Smartworx Inc. by Andrew Theodore Staes (Staes, Andrew)
August 15, 2018 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles P. Kocoras no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/15/2018. (mma, )
August 14, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F2VS Technologies, LLC as to BB Smartworx Inc. on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Haller, Timothy)
August 9, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant BB Smartworx Inc. (pj, )
August 8, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (dal, )
August 8, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff F2VS Technologies, LLC by Timothy J. Haller (Haller, Timothy)
August 8, 2018 5 Plaintiff's Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by F2VS Technologies, LLC (Haller, Timothy)
August 8, 2018 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by F2VS Technologies, LLC (Haller, Timothy)
August 8, 2018 3 Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark by F2VS Technologies, LLC (Haller, Timothy)
August 8, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haller, Timothy)
August 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by F2VS Technologies, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14798675. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Haller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F2VS Technologies, LLC v. B+B Smartworx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F2VS Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Represented By: James F McDonough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B+B Smartworx Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Theodore Staes
Represented By: Garet K. Galster
Represented By: Stephen David Scallan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?