Toliver v. Cook County Div. of Child Support

Plaintiff: Eugene Toliver
Defendant: Cook County and Cook County Div. of Child Support
Case Number: 1:2018cv05586
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 9/14/2018. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The motion for attorney representation #4 is denied. Plaintiff is to go to the Hibbler Help Desk and speak with an attorney there to see if he has the correct defendant named on his complaint. Summons will not issue at this time until the question of the correct named defendant is resolved. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 29, 2018 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing on Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and motion for attorney representation #4 is set for 9/14/2018 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 16, 2018 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
August 13, 2018 5 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Eugene Toliver. (gcy, )
August 13, 2018 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Eugene Toliver for attorney representation. (gcy, )
August 13, 2018 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Eugene Toliver for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and Affidavit. (gcy, )
August 13, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
August 13, 2018 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Eugene Toliver. (gcy, ) Text Modified on 8/16/2018 (gcy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toliver v. Cook County Div. of Child Support
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Div. of Child Support
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?