Lieponis v Lieponis et al

Plaintiff: Jonas Lieponis
Defendant: Peter Lieponis, Algis Lieponis and Old Oak Country Club, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05741
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonas Lieponis as to Old Oak Country Club, Inc. on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Leech, Steven)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 11/12/2018 #13 is granted. Status hearing set for 10/4/2018 is reset to 11/20/2018 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 9/25/2018 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 21, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Old Oak Country Club, Inc. (tg, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE AMENDED complaint by Jonas Lieponis against Algis Lieponis, Peter Lieponis (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Heftman, Jeffery)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Verona Marie Sandberg for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/25/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Sandberg, Verona)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Algis Lieponis, Peter Lieponis for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Sandberg, Verona)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Algis Lieponis, Peter Lieponis by Verona Marie Sandberg (Sandberg, Verona)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Algis Lieponis, Peter Lieponis by James John Boland (Boland, James)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Algis Lieponis, Peter Lieponis by Michael J. Summerhill (Summerhill, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonas Lieponis as to Peter Lieponis on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Leech, Steven)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonas Lieponis as to Algis Lieponis on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Leech, Steven)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonas Lieponis as to All Plaintiffs. (Leech, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Service regarding Service of 8.31.18 Notification of Docket Entry (Leech, Steven)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 10/4/2018 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 22, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Algis Lieponis, Peter Lieponis (jn, )
August 22, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (kb, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jonas Lieponis by Steven Hesser Leech (Leech, Steven)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jonas Lieponis by Jeffery Michael Heftman (Heftman, Jeffery)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Heftman, Jeffery)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Jonas Lieponis; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14857141.(Heftman, Jeffery)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lieponis v Lieponis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lieponis
Represented By: Michael J. Summerhill
Represented By: Verona Marie Sandberg
Represented By: James John Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algis Lieponis
Represented By: Michael J. Summerhill
Represented By: Verona Marie Sandberg
Represented By: James John Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Oak Country Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonas Lieponis
Represented By: Steven Hesser Leech
Represented By: Jeffery Michael Heftman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?