Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.226.68.37
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.226.68.37
Case Number: 1:2018cv05784
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference #7 is granted. Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause to conduct early discovery, in order to identify the defendant in this case. Plaintiff may issue a Rule 45 subpoena to the internet service provider associated with the defendant's IP address to obtain the name and address of the subscriber, and Plaintiff may use the information solely for purposes of this litigation. No appearance on the motion is necessary. A status hearing is set for 11/6/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/5/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jk, )
August 24, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (dal, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schulz, Mary)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14867400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.226.68.37
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.226.68.37
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?