Wright v. Stoller et al

Plaintiff: Pricilla Wright
Defendant: Christopher Stoller and Michael Stoller
Case Number: 1:2018cv05796
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the Notice of Rule 41 Dismissal #8 filed on 9/7/18. Defendant's request to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/10/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Rule 41 Dismissal of Action by Christopher Stoller. (nsf, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to plaintiff Pricilla Wright (sxb, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST by Defendant Michael Stoller to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (sxb, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Leo Stoller, guardian for Estate of Michael Stoller (sxb, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Christopher Stoller (sxb, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County with copy of eviction complaint, case number (2018-M4-3171) filed by Christopher Stoller, Michael Stoller (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Stoller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pricilla Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?