Singleton et al v. Stateville Correctional Center (NRC) et al
Plaintiff: Perry C. Singleton
Defendant: Illinois department of Correction and Stateville Correctional Center (NRC)
Case Number: 1:2018cv05826
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: By order dated September 10, 2018 #5 , the Court directed Plaintiff to file a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $400 filing fee. The Court warned Plaintiff that if he did not comply by October 15, 2018, this case would be summarily dismissed. Plaintiff has neither responded nor otherwise communicated with the Court. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with the September 10, 2018 order. Having brought this action, Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the full filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Final judgment shall enter. This case is closed. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record on the docket (that is, the Hill Correctional Center). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 10/18/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
October 18, 2018 MAILED a copy of the order dated 10/18/2018 #8 to plaintiff Perry C. Singleton. (sxb, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED, for document #5 and blank IFP sent to Perry C. Singleton returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received. (yt)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED, Acknowledgment Letter sent to Perry Carl Singleton returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received. (ec, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must: (1) either (a) submit a renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as detailed in this order, or (b) pay the statutory $400 filing fee; and (2) submit a change-of address notification confirming his current address. Plaintiff is warned that he must fill out the in forma pauperis form completely and accurately and sign it under penalty of perjury. If Plaintiff does not comply by October 15, 2018, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice pending resolution of his fee status. The Clerk is directed to send a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record on the docket (that is, the Hill Correctional Center). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/10/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
September 10, 2018 MAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of the order dated 9/10/2018 #5 to plaintiff Perry C. Singleton. (sxb, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Perry C. Singleton for attorney representation (lf, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Perry C. Singleton for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lf, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lf, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Perry C. Singleton (Exhibits). (Envelope postmarked 8/20/18) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton et al v. Stateville Correctional Center (NRC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry C. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center (NRC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?