United States of America v. Sandiego et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gary Sandiego and G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05835
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tennyson, Steven)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego. (Decatorsmith, Jonathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego(Decatorsmith, Jonathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego by Jonathan Decatorsmith (Decatorsmith, Jonathan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP due 11/5/2018. The Report must conform to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The form of the Report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd. on 9/2/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Tennyson, Steven)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Gary Sandiego on 9/2/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Tennyson, Steven)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, )
August 28, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego (jn, )
August 27, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (dal, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Steven Tennyson (Tennyson, Steven)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tennyson, Steven)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Tennyson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sandiego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Sandiego
Represented By: Jonathan Decatorsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan Decatorsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?