Parra v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Jose L. Parra, individually and on behalf of all others similary situated and Jose L. Parra
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05936
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and motion hearing held on Defendant's motion to dismiss #15 . Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #15 due by 11/09/2018. Defendant's reply due 11/30/2018. Defendant's motion to stay discovery #19 is granted. Discovery, including MID disclosures, is stayed pending the resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss. Status hearing set for 12/19/2018 at 10:00 a.m.Emailed notice (slb, )
October 8, 2018 Filing 23 STATUS Report by Jose L. Parra (Drury, Larry)
October 1, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The defense motion #17 for extra pages is granted, and the brief is accepted. The other motions #15 #19 are reset to the previously set status hearing date and time of 10/10/2018 at 8:45 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC(Valdetero, Jena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #19 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/3/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) (Valdetero, Jena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #17 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/3/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC for leave to file excess pages in support of its motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, to stay (Valdetero, Jena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/3/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, or, in the alternative, motion to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Valdetero, Jena)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:By agreement of the parties, the status hearing of 10/9/2018 is reset to 10/10/2018 at 8:45 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's extension motion #7 to answer is granted to 09/26/2018. Going forward, however, any motion must have a statement of conferral as required by Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures. Emailed notice (slb, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC by Robert Brunner (Brunner, Robert)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction regarding notice of motion #8 , notice of motion #9 . (smm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED RE- NOTICE of Motion by Jena M. Valdetero for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/6/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Valdetero, Jena)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 ENTERED in Error. (Valdetero, Jena) Modified on 9/4/2018 (smm).
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 ENTERED in Error. (Valdetero, Jena) Modified on 9/4/2018 (smm).
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint (Valdetero, Jena)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 10/09/2018 at 8:45 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
August 29, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (daj, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC by Jena M. Valdetero (Valdetero, Jena)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Valdetero, Jena)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2018CH09242) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14888767. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Valdetero, Jena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parra v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Jena M. Valdetero
Represented By: Robert Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Parra, individually and on behalf of all others similary situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Parra
Represented By: Larry D. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?