Diermeier v. Del Gallo et al
Plaintiff: Daniel A Diermeier
Defendant: Cassandra AMG LLC, Firstsight B, LLC and Paul Del Gallo
Case Number: 1:2018cv05942
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Motion for extension of time to respond to complaint by 11/15/2018 #8 is granted. Status hearing is set for 11/29/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Motion for entry of default order against Cassandra AMG LLC and Firstsight B LLC #5 is entered and continued. Motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #8 is entered and continued. Status hearing set for 10/23/2018 at 9:30 a.m., all parties are required to attend. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel A Diermeier by Michael P Croghan Amended (Croghan, Michael)
October 8, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel A Diermeier by Michael P Croghan (Croghan, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Daniel A Diermeier for extension of time to respond to complaint. (Exhibit). (eaa, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 RE- NOTICE of Motion by Giel Stein for presentment of motion for entry of default #5 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/9/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Giel)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Giel Stein for presentment of motion for entry of default #5 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/4/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Giel)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Daniel A Diermeier for entry of default Order Against Cassandra AMG LLC and FirstSight B, LLC (Stein, Giel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel A Diermeier as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Stein, Giel)
August 30, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (jjr, )
August 30, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cassandra AMG LLC, Paul Del Gallo, Firstsight B, LLC (pj, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel A Diermeier by Giel Stein (Stein, Giel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stein, Giel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel A Diermeier; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14890209. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Stein, Giel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diermeier v. Del Gallo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra AMG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstsight B, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Del Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A Diermeier
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Michael P Croghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?