California Check Cashing Stores, LLC v. Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: California Check Cashing Stores, LLC
Defendant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06072
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 2/19/19. Status hearing held on 2/19/19. The parties report that they have settled the case. This case is dismissed without prejudice; the dismissal will become with prejudice on 2/28/19. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 2/5/19. The parties report that they are working towards settling this case. Defendant's motion to vacate default #26 is entered and continued for 2/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 2/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE by California Check Cashing Stores, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. to vacate Defendant AUCRA's Motion to Vacate Default #26 (Haarlow, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing previously set for 1/10/19 is stricken.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. to vacate Defendant AUCRA's Motion to Vacate Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stephens, Shand)
December 20, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Shand Stephens #23 is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 12/19/18. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default judgment #19 is entered and continued for 2/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Motion to vacate default shall be due by 1/4/19; response due by 1/18/18. Status hearing set for 2/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15293355. (Stephens, Shand)
December 18, 2018 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. by Joseph Michael Carey (Carey, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. by Joseph Anton Roselius (Roselius, Joseph)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of motion for default judgment #19 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/19/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Haarlow, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff California Check Cashing Stores, LLC for default judgment as to Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haarlow, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 12/6/18. The request for clerk's entry of default #16 is granted. Default is entered as to Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment shall be due by 12/14/18 and should be noticed up for presentment 12/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. A copy of the motion should be served on the Defendant. Status hearing set for 12/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Haarlow, John)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST For Default (REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haarlow, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 11/6/18. Plaintiff reports that service has been effectuated on the Defendant and he will be filing a motion for default. Status hearing set for 1/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS Report (Initial) by California Check Cashing Stores, LLC (Marinello, Mitchell)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 11/6/18 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file an initial status report as set forth in the Judge's standing order four business days prior to the status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Check Cashing Stores, LLC (Haarlow, John)
September 10, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. (kb, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 PAYMENT regarding #1 of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14927975. (Haarlow, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $47.00, receipt no. 0752-14911688, regarding miscellaneous case #1 (Haarlow, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion to reclassify this case as a civil complaint #6 as a bit of administrative clean-up because it had mistakenly been classified as a miscellaneous case. The Clerk of the Court is hereby notified of the change and is ordered to treat this case accordingly. The clerk's office is directed to refund the $47.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is directed to pay the $400.00 filing fee. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Re- NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Haarlow, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/13/2018 at 09:00 PM. (Haarlow, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff California Check Cashing Stores, LLC to Reclassify Case as Civil Complaint (Haarlow, John)
September 5, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (jjr, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by California Check Cashing Stores, LLC (Marinello, Mitchell)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff California Check Cashing Stores, LLC by John B Haarlow, Jr (Haarlow, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff California Check Cashing Stores, LLC by Mitchell L. Marinello (Marinello, Mitchell)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marinello, Mitchell)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by California Check Cashing Stores, LLC Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Marinello, Mitchell) Text Modified on 9/11/2018 (gcy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Check Cashing Stores, LLC v. Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Shand S. Stephens
Represented By: Joseph Anton Roselius
Represented By: Joseph Michael Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Check Cashing Stores, LLC
Represented By: John B Haarlow, Jr.
Represented By: Mitchell L. Marinello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?