Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. v. Sadia & Nadia Corp., et al

Plaintiff: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance and Capital One Equipment Finance Corp.
Defendant: Abid Khan and Sadia & Nadia Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06078
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #10 . Plaintiff has properly completed service of process on Defendants, Defendants have not answered, and the time for answering the Complaint has expired. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #10 is granted. Plaintiff shall file, no later than 11/08/2018 a motion for default judgment in sum certain, noticed for presentment to coincide with the 11/13/2018 status hearing date and time. Plaintiff may file and present the motion earlier if ready to do so. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 15, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion by Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko for presentment of motion for entry of default #10 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/24/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Lesko, Christina)
October 15, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT of Christina J. Lesko regarding motion for entry of default #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lesko, Christina)
October 15, 2018 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. for entry of default (Lesko, Christina)
October 1, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. as to Sadia & Nadia Corp. on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Lesko, Christina)
September 17, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. as to Abid Khan on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Lesko, Christina)
September 7, 2018 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 8:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
September 6, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Abid Khan, Sadia & Nadia Corp. (jjr, )
September 6, 2018 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm)
September 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (acm)
September 5, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance by Robert Edward Browne, Jr (Browne, Robert)
September 5, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance by Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko (Lesko, Christina)
September 5, 2018 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance re complaint #1 (Lesko, Christina)
September 5, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lesko, Christina)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14912631. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Lesko, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. v. Sadia & Nadia Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abid Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadia & Nadia Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance
Represented By: Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko
Represented By: Robert Edward Browne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp.
Represented By: Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko
Represented By: Robert Edward Browne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?