United States of America v. Rodriguez
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Leticia Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2018cv06080
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the request of the Plaintiff, status hearing set for 11/7/2018 #11 is stricken and re-set for 11/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Civil Rule 55(b) prove-up hearing is set for 11/7/2018 #11 is stricken and re-set for 11/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file his Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment by 11/7/2018, and shall serve Defendant via overnight delivery with its motion and a copy of this order. See N.D. Ill. L.R. 5.3(a). If Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) motion, Defendant must file a written opposition or appear at the 11/20/2018 hearing. If Defendant does not respond or appear, the court will rule on the Rule 55(b) motion at the 11/20/2018 hearing. If Defendant would like to appear telephonically at the 11/20/2018 hearing, she must by 11/19/2018 make advance arrangements with Courtroom Deputy Jackie Deanes (312-435-5568).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 11/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, a Civil Rule 55(a) default is entered against Defendant Leticia Rodriguez. A Civil Rule 55(b) prove-up hearing is set for 11/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file his Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment by 11/2/2018, and shall serve Defendant via overnight delivery with its motion and a copy of this order. See N.D. Ill. L.R. 5.3(a). If Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) motion, Defendant must file a written opposition or appear at the 11/7/2018 hearing. If Defendant does not respond or appear, the court will rule on the Rule 55(b) motion at the 11/7/2018 hearing. If Defendant would like to appear telephonically at the 11/7/2018 hearing, she must by 11/6/2018 make advance arrangements with Courtroom Deputy Jackie Deanes (312-435-5568).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to reset status hearing #8 is granted. Status hearing set for 10/15/2018 #7 is stricken and re-set for 11/1/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing set for 10/15/2018 #9 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Tennyson for presentment of motion to reset #8 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Tennyson, Steven)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to reset Status Conference (Tennyson, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 10/1/2018 #5 is stricken and re-set for 10/15/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Leticia Rodriguez on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Tennyson, Steven)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 10/1/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 6, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Leticia Rodriguez (rc, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
September 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (acm)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Steven Tennyson (Tennyson, Steven)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tennyson, Steven)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Tennyson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?