Jamison v. Chaplain of Stateville Correctional Center Mr. Adamson et al
Plaintiff: Clyde Jamison
Defendant: Chaplaint of Stateville Correctional Center Mr. Adamson and Chaplain of Stateveille Correctional Center Mr. Adamson
Case Number: 1:2018cv06103
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/2/2018: By order dated October 23, 2018 #8 , the court extended the date for Plaintiff to pay the filing fee to November 25, 2018, and warned him that if he failed to pay, this case would be summarily dismissed. In response #9 , Plaintiff represents that he has asked Stateville's trust fund officer to pay the full $400 filing fee using funds from his trust fund account. In light of Plaintiff's stated concerns regarding the timing of payment, the date for Plaintiff to prepay the full $400 filing fee is extended to December 14, 2018. If Plaintiff complies, the court will consider his response to the order to show cause. If he fails to do so, court staff will confirm whether a payment request is pending. If Plaintiff has not submitted a timely payment request, this case will be summarily dismissed. Mailed notice (mw, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Clyde Jamison to Judge Order denying Plaintiff application for in forma pauperis. (jh, )
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: By order dated October 1, 2018 #5 , the court denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP), ordered him to pay the $400 filing fee and to explain questionable statements in his application, and directed him to correct his application if it contained any inaccuracies. In response, Plaintiff filed a statement #7 that addresses the more than $1,300 in lawsuit proceeds he received but makes no mention of the $895 in gifts he received during the six-month lookback period. (The court notes that this total does not appear to be an anomaly; trust fund ledgers obtained by court staff show that Plaintiff recovered a total of an additional $998.39 in income from the end date of the trust fund ledgers provided by Plaintiff to October 22, 2018, and that he has a current trust fund balance of $1,647.17.) Plaintiffs renewed IFP application #6 is denied. Plaintiff continues to be ineligible to pay the filing fee in installments. The date for Plaintiff to prepay the full $400 filing fee is extended to November 25, 2018. If he complies, the court will consider his response to the order to show cause. If he fails to do so, this case will be summarily dismissed. The court again reminds Plaintiff that he is expected to conserve his assets so he can pay any filing fees that might be imposed in the future. If he cannot prepay a future filing fee because he has spent all of his assets, he likely will not be eligible to pay in installments. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/23/2018. Mailed notice(jh, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 WRITTEN Explaination filed by Clyde Jamison for what appears to be False Statements in his informa pauperis. (jh, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Clyde Jamison for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
October 2, 2018 MAILED a blank in forma pauperis application to the Plaintiff. (jh, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must: (1) pay the $400 filing fee; and (2) provide a written explanation for what appears to be false statements in his in forma pauperis application. In addition, Plaintiff must correct his IFP application if it contains any inaccuracies other than those identified in this order. He must also advise the court if the $1,000 entry on his trust fund statement is from a source other than the settlement proceeds in Jamison v. Freaky, Case No. 13 C 0486 (S.D. Ill.) (Gilbert, J.). If that is the case, Plaintiff must identify the source of the funds. If Plaintiff fails to comply with these directives by October 31, 2018, this case will be summarily dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/1/2018. Mailed notice (jh, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Clyde Jamison for appointment of counsel. (gcy, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Clyde Jamison for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Clyde Jamison. (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. Chaplain of Stateville Correctional Center Mr. Adamson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplaint of Stateville Correctional Center Mr. Adamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain of Stateveille Correctional Center Mr. Adamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?