J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Connolly

Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Defendant: Thomas Connolly
Debtor In Possession: Connolly Currency Exchanges, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06230
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), this case is dismissed without prejudice for 30 days. Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer #7 is stricken. Motion hearing set for 10/15/2018 is stricken. If no motion to reinstate is filed by 11/13/2018, the dismissal shall automatically convert to one with prejudice with no further action by the court. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff J&J Sports Productions Inc to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A). (Smith, Zane)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 10/9/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff did not appear. The defendant contends that he has been improperly named in this action. The defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is entered and continued to 10/15/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Justin E. Burtnett for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/9/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Burtnett, Justin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Thomas Connolly for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Burtnett, Justin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomas Connolly by Justin E. Burtnett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Burtnett, Justin)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions Inc as to Thomas Connolly on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Smith, Zane)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Thomas Connolly. (kb, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J&J Sports Productions Inc by Zane D. Smith (Smith, Zane)
September 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (ec, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Zane)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14936470.(Smith, Zane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Connolly
Represented By: Justin E. Burtnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Connolly Currency Exchanges, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?