S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. v. Copesan Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. and Copesan Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06268
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 26 RESPONSE by S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc., Copesan Services, Inc. to dismiss for Improper Venue and Alternatively for Transfer #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration B)(Letchinger, John)
October 26, 2018 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. by Matthew J Caccamo (Caccamo, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 11/1/18 is reset to 12/18/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 16, 2018 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss for improper venue or alternatively to transfer #20 shall be due by 11/8/18; reply due by 11/22/18. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 15, 2018 22 AFFIDAVIT by Defendants Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendants Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc., Copesan Services, Inc. to dismiss for Improper Venue and Alternatively for Transfer #20 Declaration of Joe Tauchen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Joe Tauchen)(Stellpflug, Janet)
October 15, 2018 21 MEMORANDUM by Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss, #20 for Improper Venue and Alternatively for Transfer (Stellpflug, Janet)
October 15, 2018 20 MOTION by Defendants Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc., Copesan Services, Inc. to dismiss for Improper Venue and Alternatively for Transfer (Attachments: #1 Copesan's Notification as to Affiliates, #2 Wil-Kil's Notification as to Affiliates)(Stellpflug, Janet)
October 15, 2018 19 NOTICE of Motion by Scott J. Brown for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/24/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Brown, Scott)
October 10, 2018 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. as to Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Letchinger, John)
October 10, 2018 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. as to Copesan Services, Inc. on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Letchinger, John)
October 2, 2018 16 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. (McIlwee, John)
October 2, 2018 15 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. (Letchinger, John)
October 1, 2018 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. by James A. Foster (Foster, James)
October 1, 2018 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. by Scott J. Brown (Brown, Scott)
October 1, 2018 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. by John Charles Gardner (Gardner, John)
October 1, 2018 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. by John Thomas (Thomas, John)
October 1, 2018 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. by Janet Stellpflug (Stellpflug, Janet)
September 27, 2018 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motions to appear pro hac vice by Janet Stellpflug #7 and John Thomas #8 are granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 26, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14995930. (Thomas, John)
September 26, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14995634. (Stellpflug, Janet)
September 17, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Copesan Services, Inc., Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc. (yt)
September 14, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 11/1/18 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 14, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
September 13, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. by John Conlaeth McIlwee (McIlwee, John)
September 13, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. by John Sheldon Letchinger (Letchinger, John)
September 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (pj, )
September 13, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Letchinger, John)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14944759.(Letchinger, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc. v. Copesan Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wil-Kil Pest Control Company, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Foster
Represented By: Janet Stellpflug
Represented By: Scott J. Brown
Represented By: John Thomas
Represented By: John Charles Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copesan Services, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Foster
Represented By: Janet Stellpflug
Represented By: Scott J. Brown
Represented By: John Thomas
Represented By: John Charles Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.T. Specialty Foods, Inc.
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: John Sheldon Letchinger
Represented By: Matthew J Caccamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?