Homeland Insurance Company of New York v. Health Care Service Corporation

Plaintiff: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv06306
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 23 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation. (Goodsir, David)
November 9, 2018 22 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Cloutier, Kevin)
October 23, 2018 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion to appear pro hac vice #19 is granted. Mailed notice. (cc, )
October 10, 2018 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Health Care Service Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goodsir, David)
October 8, 2018 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15032947. (Brooks, John)
October 1, 2018 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Initial status hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 9:00 a.m. MIDP disclosures shall be served by 11/9/2018. The parties shall file a joint status report by 11/15/2018. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 27, 2018 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Mark Stuart Hersh (Hersh, Mark)
September 27, 2018 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Emily E. Garrison (Garrison, Emily)
September 27, 2018 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by David V. Goodsir (Goodsir, David)
September 27, 2018 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr (Hofmeister, Dan)
September 26, 2018 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York as to Health Care Service Corporation on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Sutrina, Mikela)
September 18, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Health Care Service Corporation (dal, )
September 17, 2018 12 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm)
September 17, 2018 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to appear pro hac vice #7 and #8 are granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 17, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 10/1/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 17, 2018 9 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Homeland Insurance Company of New York regarding MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14950970. #8 (Casey, Justine)
September 14, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14950970. (Casey, Justine)
September 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (pj, )
September 14, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14950938. (Crispen, Richard)
September 14, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Homeland Insurance Company of New York by Mikela Therese Sutrina (Sutrina, Mikela)
September 14, 2018 5 NOTICE by Homeland Insurance Company of New York of Related Case (Cloutier, Kevin)
September 14, 2018 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Homeland Insurance Company of New York (Cloutier, Kevin)
September 14, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Homeland Insurance Company of New York by Kevin M Cloutier (Cloutier, Kevin)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cloutier, Kevin)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14950548. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Cloutier, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homeland Insurance Company of New York v. Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Emily E. Garrison
Represented By: Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Stuart Hersh
Represented By: David V. Goodsir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Kevin M Cloutier
Represented By: Mikela Therese Sutrina
Represented By: Justine M. Casey
Represented By: John Tinley Brooks
Represented By: Richard Randal Crispen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?